EP2171487 - MULTI-CHANNEL CAPACITIVE SENSING CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Barun Electronics Co., Ltd. Nr.634-1, Tongsam-ri, Namsa-myeon Cheoin-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 449-884 / KR | [2010/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHN, Taedong Samho-village 204 100-271 Bongcheon 6-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-056 / KR | [2010/14] | Representative(s) | Kindermann, Peter Patentanwälte Kindermann Postfach 10 02 34 85593 Baldham / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | Kindermann, Peter Kindermann Patentanwälte Postfach 10 02 34 85593 Baldham / DE | Application number, filing date | 07793685.4 | 24.08.2007 | [2010/14] | WO2007KR04089 | Priority number, date | KR20070072444 | 19.07.2007 Original published format: KR 20070072444 | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009011473 | Date: | 22.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2171487 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01R27/26, G01D5/24, G06F3/044 | [2015/05] | CPC: |
G01D5/24 (EP,KR,US);
G01R27/26 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2010/14] | G01R27/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | MEHRKANALIGE KAPAZITIVE MESSSCHALTUNG | [2010/14] | English: | MULTI-CHANNEL CAPACITIVE SENSING CIRCUIT | [2010/14] | French: | CIRCUIT DE DÉTECTION CAPACITIF À MULTIPLES CANAUX | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 07.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 15.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP1538548 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-8 * abstract * * figures 6, 9, 10,16 * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0174] - paragraph [0184] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0077] * [Y] 9,10 [I] 4,11,12; | [Y]US2007159183 (UMEMURA AKINOBU [JP], et al) [Y] 9,10 * abstract * * figures 1,3 ** paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0029] * | International search | [XA]US2005005703 (SAITO JUNICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1, 7 * See Abstract, Paragraph [0051] ~ Paragraph [0061], Figures 2, 5, 6, Claim 2 * [A] 2-6, 8-12; | [XA]US2005024065 (UMEDA YUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1, 7, 8 * See Abstract, Paragraph[0037] ~ Paragraph [0050],Figures1, 5, 9, Claim 2 * [A] 2-6, 9-12; | [A]US7061250 (TESDAHL CURTIS A [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * See Abstract, Column 9, Line 38 - Column 12 Line 48, Figures 12, 15, 17, Claim 1 *; | [A]US2007152682 (UNGARETTI TOMMASO [IT], et al) [A] 1-12* See Abstract, Paragraph [0027] ~ Paragraph [0062], Figures 5, 10, Claims 1, 16, 22 * |