EP2051895 - A SHOPPING CART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Starck, Kristiina Kvarnbäcksvägen 3 974 51 Luleå / SE | [2009/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | Janson, Ronny Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyrå AB Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | Janson, Ronny Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07794105.2 | 07.08.2007 | [2009/18] | WO2007SE00709 | Priority number, date | SE20060001658 | 09.08.2006 Original published format: SE 0601658 | [2009/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008018824 | Date: | 14.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2051895 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 14.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B62B3/14 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
B62B3/144 (EP);
B62B5/0016 (SE);
B62B3/0643 (EP);
B62B3/1476 (EP);
B62B2202/90 (EP);
B62B2203/07 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/18] | Title | German: | EINKAUFSWAGEN | [2009/18] | English: | A SHOPPING CART | [2009/18] | French: | Chariot de supermarché | [2013/51] |
Former [2009/18] | CADDIE | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 04.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 27.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.12.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2009 | 31.08.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4202428 (WANZL METALLWARENFABRIK KG [DE]); | [A]DE29916347U (WANZL METALLWARENFABRIK KG [DE]); | [A]DE20314047U (WANZL METALLWARENFABRIK KG [DE]); | [A]DE202006005137U (LKE GES FUER LOGISTIK & KOMMUNIKATIONS EQUIPMENT MBH [DE]); | [P]WO2006094470 (WANZL METALLWARENFABRIK KG [DE], et al) |