EP2013790 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING CONTINUOUS DATA PROTECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Network Appliance, Inc. 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Ling 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 02 /
ENGLISH, Robert M. c/o Network Appliance, Inc. 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 03 /
MANLEY, Stephen, L. 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 04 /
LEWIS, Blake, H. 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2009/21] |
Former [2009/16] | 01 /
ZHENG, Ling 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | ||
02 /
ENGLISH, Robert M. c/o Netapp, Inc. 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | |||
03 /
MANLEY, Stephen, L. 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | |||
04 /
LEWIS, Blake, H. 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | |||
Former [2009/10] | 01 /
ZHENG, Ling 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | ||
02 /
ENGLISH, Robert M. 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | |||
03 /
MANLEY, Stephen, L. 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | |||
04 /
LEWIS, Blake, H. 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | |||
Former [2009/03] | 01 /
ZHENG, Ling 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | ||
02 /
ENGLISH, Robert, M. 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | |||
03 /
MANLEY, Stephen, L. 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | |||
04 /
LEWIS, Blake, H. 495 East Java Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Kay, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Rupprecht, Kay, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07794388.4 | 26.04.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007US10223 | Priority number, date | US20060413882 | 28.04.2006 Original published format: US 413882 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007127361 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2013790 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06F11/14 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
G06F11/1435 (EP,US);
G06F16/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Extension states | AL | 27.10.2008 | BA | 27.10.2008 | HR | 27.10.2008 | MK | 27.10.2008 | RS | 27.10.2008 | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON KONTINUIERLICHEM DATENSCHUTZ | [2009/03] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING CONTINUOUS DATA PROTECTION | [2009/03] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR ASSURER UNE PROTECTION CONTINUE DES DONNEES | [2009/03] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 07.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/44] | 24.04.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/44] | 15.06.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.01.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0229573 (NETWORK APPLIANCE INC [US]) [X] 1-25 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, paragraph 6 * * page 6, paragraph LAST - page 10, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US2006047925 (PERRY ROBERT [US]) [A] 1-25 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0015] *; | [A]WO2004044746 (INASOFT INC [US]) [A] 1-25 * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0112] * | Examination | US2005192932 | US5819292 | - SANTRY D J ET AL, "Elephant: the file system that never forgets", HOT TOPICS IN OPERATING SYSTEMS, 1999. PROCEEDINGS OF THE SEVENTH WORK SHOP ON RIO RICO, AZ, USA 29-30 MARCH 1999, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19990329), doi:10.1109/HOTOS.1999.798369, ISBN 978-0-7695-0237-3, pages 2 - 7, XP010355840 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/HOTOS.1999.798369 | - ROSENBLUM M ET AL, "THE DESIGN AND IMPLEMENTATION OF A LOG-STRUCTURED FILE SYSTEM", OPERATING SYSTEMS REVIEW, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19910101), vol. 25, no. 5, doi:10.1145/121133.121137, ISSN 0163-5980, pages 1 - 15, XP000288298 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/121133.121137 |