EP2083710 - SURGICAL STAPLING INSTRUMENT WITH MECHANICAL INDICATOR TO SHOW LEVELS OF TISSUE COMPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | [2009/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OMAITS, Todd, Phillip 7446 Airy View Drive Liberty Township, OH 45044 / US | 02 /
THOMPSON, Bennie 9422 Oakhurst Court Cincinnati, OH 45241 / US | 03 /
SHELTON, Frederick, E. Post Office Box 373 New Vienna, OH 45159 / US | 04 /
TIMPERMAN, Eugene, L. 10639 Silverbrook Drive Cincinnati, OH 45240 / US | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2014/27] |
Former [2009/32] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07794660.6 | 08.05.2007 | [2009/32] | WO2007US11118 | Priority number, date | US20060529879 | 29.09.2006 Original published format: US 529879 | [2009/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008039250 | Date: | 03.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2083710 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2083710 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/064, A61B17/068, A61B17/10, A61B17/115, A61B17/00 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
A61B17/072 (EP,US);
A61B17/064 (EP,US);
A61B17/0644 (EP,US);
A61B17/068 (EP,US);
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B17/07292 (EP,US);
A61B17/105 (EP,US);
A61B17/115 (EP,US);
A61B17/1155 (EP,US);
A61B17/11 (EP,US);
A61B17/1114 (EP,US);
A61B17/34 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00128 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00539 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00831 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00862 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0641 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07228 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07242 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0725 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07257 (US);
A61B2017/07264 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07271 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07278 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07285 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2932 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2943 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320052 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00666 (EP,US);
A61B2090/032 (EP,US);
A61B2090/036 (EP,US);
A61B2090/065 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHES KLAMMERINSTRUMENT MIT MECHANISCHEM INDIKATOR ZUM ANZEIGEN DES GRADS DER GEWEBEKOMPRESSION | [2009/32] | English: | SURGICAL STAPLING INSTRUMENT WITH MECHANICAL INDICATOR TO SHOW LEVELS OF TISSUE COMPRESSION | [2009/32] | French: | AGRAFEUSE CHIRURGICALE AVEC INDICATEUR MECANIQUE DE NIVEAU DE COMPRESSION TISSULAIRE | [2014/01] |
Former [2009/32] | AGRAFEUSE CHIRURGICALE AVEC INDICATEUR MÉCANIQUE DE NIVEAU DE COMPRESSION TISSULAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 13.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14175319.4 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 02.08.2014 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.05.2007 | AT | 02.07.2014 | BE | 02.07.2014 | CY | 02.07.2014 | CZ | 02.07.2014 | DK | 02.07.2014 | EE | 02.07.2014 | ES | 02.07.2014 | FI | 02.07.2014 | LT | 02.07.2014 | LV | 02.07.2014 | MC | 02.07.2014 | MT | 02.07.2014 | NL | 02.07.2014 | PL | 02.07.2014 | RO | 02.07.2014 | SE | 02.07.2014 | SI | 02.07.2014 | SK | 02.07.2014 | TR | 02.07.2014 | BG | 02.10.2014 | GR | 03.10.2014 | IS | 02.11.2014 | PT | 03.11.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
BE | 02.07.2014 | ||
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
MT | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
BE | 02.07.2014 | ||
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LV | 02.07.2014 | ||
NL | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 02.07.2014 | |
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
FI | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 02.07.2014 | |
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
SE | 02.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 02.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5366134 (GREEN DAVID T [US], et al) [X] 1-6* the whole document *; | [X]US5653721 (KNODEL BRYAN D [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002117534 (GREEN DAVID T [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0136] - [0142] *; | [X]WO03090630 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * pages 3,4,6 - pages 14-26 *; | [X]EP1652481 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XP]EP1728475 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [XP] 1-10 * paragraphs [0008] - [0017] - paragraphs [0047] - [0087] * |