EP2018519 - SENSOR ADAPTORS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WATLOW ELECTRIC MANUFACTURING COMPANY 12001 Lackland Road St. Louis Missouri 63146 / US | [2009/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOVACEVICH, Steven, A. W 3664 Jostad Road Mindoro, WI 54644 / US | [2009/05] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/37] |
Former [2014/09] | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2013/30] | Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2009/05] | Knapp, Thomas Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07795170.5 | 21.05.2007 | [2009/05] | WO2007US12180 | Priority number, date | US20060437945 | 19.05.2006 Original published format: US 437945 | [2009/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007136854 | Date: | 29.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2018519 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2018519 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/246 | [2009/05] | CPC: |
G01D5/246 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/37] |
Former [2009/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SENSORADAPTER UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN | [2015/17] | English: | SENSOR ADAPTORS AND METHODS | [2009/05] | French: | ADAPTATEURS DE CAPTEURS ET PROCÉDÉS CORRESPONDANTS | [2009/05] |
Former [2009/05] | SENSORADAPTER UND ENTSPRECHENDE VERFAHREN | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/05] | 04.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.03.2015 | 24.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 31.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.05.2007 | BE | 09.09.2015 | BG | 09.09.2015 | CY | 09.09.2015 | CZ | 09.09.2015 | DK | 09.09.2015 | EE | 09.09.2015 | ES | 09.09.2015 | FI | 09.09.2015 | IT | 09.09.2015 | LT | 09.09.2015 | LV | 09.09.2015 | MC | 09.09.2015 | PL | 09.09.2015 | RO | 09.09.2015 | SI | 09.09.2015 | SK | 09.09.2015 | TR | 09.09.2015 | GR | 10.12.2015 | IS | 09.01.2016 | PT | 11.01.2016 | IE | 21.05.2016 | LU | 21.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 21.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 21.05.2016 | ||
LU | 21.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 21.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
TR | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 21.05.2016 | ||
LU | 21.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.05.2007 | |
BE | 09.09.2015 | ||
CY | 09.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
MC | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 21.05.2016 | ||
LU | 21.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | BE | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
IE | 21.05.2016 | ||
LU | 21.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | BE | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 21.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | BE | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
LU | 21.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 09.09.2015 | |
CZ | 09.09.2015 | ||
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
DK | 09.09.2015 | ||
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SI | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
PL | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
PT | 11.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
RO | 09.09.2015 | ||
SK | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 09.09.2015 | |
EE | 09.09.2015 | ||
ES | 09.09.2015 | ||
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 09.09.2015 | |
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
IT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 09.09.2015 | |
FI | 09.09.2015 | ||
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 09.09.2015 | |
LT | 09.09.2015 | ||
LV | 09.09.2015 | ||
GR | 10.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 09.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4206648 (ROBBI ANTHONY D [US], et al) [A] 23-28,30-33* abstract *; | [X]EP0145935 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,22,29 * abstract *; | [X]JPS60181802 (YOKOGAWA HOKUSHIN ELECTRIC) [X] 1,22,29 * abstract *; | [X]GB2215150 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-36 * page 1, line 2 - page 8, line 7; figures 1-8 * |