EP2030274 - HEAT AND WATER MANAGEMENT DEVICE AND METHOD IN FUEL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2018 | Change - withdrawal | published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] | 20.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board Of Trustees Of The University Of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of Technology Licensing 1705 El Camino Real Palo Alto, CA 94306-1106 / US | For all designated states Honda Giken Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1 Minami-Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states The Board Of Trustees Of The University Of the Leland Stanford Junior University Office of Technology Licensing 1705 El Camino Real Palo Alto, CA 94306-1106 / US | ||
For all designated states Honda Giken Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1 Minami-Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUBOTA, Tadahiro 3-3-83-402 Honchou Asaka, Saitama, 351-0011 / JP | 02 /
SASAHARA, Jun 2-2-6 Minamidai Kawagoe-shi, Saitama, 350-1165 / JP | 03 /
FABIAN, Tibor 541 Chiquita Avenue Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | 04 /
BUIE, Cullen 3351 Alma Street, 225 Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 05 /
LITSTER, Shawn 87 Hulme Street, Appartment 716 Stanford, CA 94305 / US | 06 /
SANTIAGO, Juan, G. 714 Alvarado Rostanfordad Stanford, CA 94305 / US | [2009/15] |
Former [2009/10] | 01 /
KUBOTA, Tadahiro 3-3-83-402 Honchou Asaka, Saitama, 351-0011 / JP | ||
02 /
SASAHARA, Jun 2-2-6 Minamidai Kawagoe-shi, Saitama, 350-1165 / JP | |||
03 /
FABIAN, Tibor 1990 Latham St. 35 Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | |||
04 /
BUIE, Cullen 3351 Alma Street, 225 Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | |||
05 /
LITSTER, Shawn 105 Hoskins Court Apt Stanford, CA 94305 / US | |||
06 /
SANTIAGO, Juan, G. 714 Alvarado Rostanfordad Stanford, CA 94305 / US | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al 27 Clyde Road Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2009/10] | Coyle, Philip Aidan, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 07795354.5 | 25.05.2007 | [2009/10] | WO2007US12496 | Priority number, date | US20060808493P | 25.05.2006 Original published format: US 808493 P | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007139940 | Date: | 06.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2030274 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02, H01M8/04 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
H01M8/023 (EP,US);
H01M8/04 (KR);
H01M8/0245 (EP,US);
H01M8/0258 (US);
H01M8/0267 (EP);
H01M8/04074 (EP,US);
H01M8/04126 (EP,US);
H01M8/04171 (EP,US);
H01M8/04291 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/10] | H01M8/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR WÄRME- UND WASSERVERWALTUNG BEI BRENNSTOFFZELLEN | [2009/10] | English: | HEAT AND WATER MANAGEMENT DEVICE AND METHOD IN FUEL CELLS | [2009/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE CHALEUR ET D'EAU DANS DES PILES À COMBUSTIBLE | [2009/10] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 04.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | deleted | Deletion: Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/21] | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/21] | 01.12.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/20] | 04.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03030286 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 3, lines 5-18 * * page 4, lines 12-30 * * page 7, line 26 - page 8, line 6 ** figures 1-4 *; | [XI]US2004170878 (GOEBEL STEVEN G [US]) [X] 1-5,9-12,14-16,19 * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0000] , [0019] , [0027] , [0028] , [0042] - [0045] - [0054] * [I] 6-8,13,17,18,20 | International search | [X]US4826741 (ADLHART OTTO J [US], et al) | by applicant | US2004170878 |