EP2021042 - MEDICAL DEVICES HAVING IMPROVED DRUG RELEASE PROFILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/07] | MEDICAL DEVICES HAVING IMPROVED PERFORMANCE | ||
[2011/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited P.O. Box 1317 Seaston House Hastings Christ Church / BB | [2009/20] |
Former [2009/07] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311-1566 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRICKLER, Frederick 45 Village Brook Lane 5 Natick, MA 01760 / US | 02 /
RANADE, Shrirang, V. 35 Russell Place Arlington, MA 02474 / US | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Hermann, Gerhard Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | Hermann, Gerhard Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/34] | Hermann, Gerhard Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/07] | Jungblut & Seuss Patentanwälte Max-Dohrn-Strasse 10 10589 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 07795660.5 | 01.06.2007 | [2009/07] | WO2007US13051 | Priority number, date | US20060444804 | 01.06.2006 Original published format: US 444804 | [2009/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007143159 | Date: | 13.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2021042 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2021042 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/16 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
A61L29/041 (EP,US);
A61L27/16 (EP,US);
A61L29/16 (EP,US);
A61L31/048 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61L2300/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/16, C08L53/005 (EP,US);
A61L29/041, C08L53/005 (US,EP);
A61L31/048, C08L53/005 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/07] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE GERÄTE MIT VERBESSERTEM WIRKSTOFFREISETZUNGSPROFIL | [2012/11] | English: | MEDICAL DEVICES HAVING IMPROVED DRUG RELEASE PROFILE | [2011/33] | French: | DISPOSITIFS MÉDICAUX AVEC UN PROFIL AMÉLIORÉ DE LIBÉRATION DE MÉDICAMENTS | [2012/11] |
Former [2009/07] | MEDIZINISCHE GERÄTE MIT VERBESSERTER LEISTUNG | ||
Former [2009/07] | MEDICAL DEVICES HAVING IMPROVED PERFORMANCE | ||
Former [2009/07] | DISPOSITIFS MÉDICAUX AYANT DES PERFORMANCES AMÉLIORÉES | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 20.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 07.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/09] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.04.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.05.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.06.2007 | AT | 21.03.2012 | BE | 21.03.2012 | CY | 21.03.2012 | CZ | 21.03.2012 | DK | 21.03.2012 | EE | 21.03.2012 | FI | 21.03.2012 | LT | 21.03.2012 | LV | 21.03.2012 | MT | 21.03.2012 | NL | 21.03.2012 | PL | 21.03.2012 | RO | 21.03.2012 | SE | 21.03.2012 | SI | 21.03.2012 | SK | 21.03.2012 | TR | 21.03.2012 | LU | 01.06.2012 | BG | 21.06.2012 | GB | 21.06.2012 | GR | 22.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | ES | 02.07.2012 | IS | 21.07.2012 | PT | 23.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
TR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LU | 01.06.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GB | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
TR | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GB | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GB | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
GB | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GB | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GB | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
PL | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 21.03.2012 | |
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 21.03.2012 | |
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 21.03.2012 | |
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 21.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0119920 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-36 * page 14, line 6 - page 15, line 17 * * page 16, lines 23-34 ** claims 1-3,7 *; | [A]US2005215722 (PINCHUNK LEONARD [US], et al) [A] 1-36 * page 1, paragraphs 5-9 * * page 10, paragraph 213 - page 11, paragraph 220 * * claims 1-51 *; | [X]US2006013849 (STRICKLER FREDERICK H [US], et al) [X] 1-36 * page 4, paragraphs 41-43 * * page 6, paragraphs 62,63 * * page 10, paragraphs 87,88 * * claims 1-19 *; | [A]US2006111485 (LAGHI ALDO A [US]) [A] 1-36 * page 1, paragraphs 10,11 * * claims 29-41 * |