EP2049552 - PROCESS FOR THE DIRECT SYNTHESIS OF TRIALKOXYSILANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Momentive Performance Materials Inc.s 187 Danbury Road Wilton, CT 06897-4122 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states Momentive Performance Materials Inc. 187 Danbury Road Wilton, CT 06897-4122 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMERON, Rudolph, A. 1705 Neshaminy Valley Drive Bensalem, PA 19020 / US | 02 /
LEWIS, Kenrick, M. 43-28 193 Street Flushing, NY 11358 / US | 03 /
RITSCHER, James, S. deceased / US | [2012/32] |
Former [2009/17] | 01 /
CAMERON, Rudolph, A. 1705 Neshaminy Valley Drive Bensalem, PA 19020 / US | ||
02 /
LEWIS, Kenrick, M. 43-28 193 Street Flushing, NY 11358 / US | |||
03 /
RITSCHER, James, S. deceased / US | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07795785.0 | 06.06.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007US13289 | Priority number, date | US20060450538 | 09.06.2006 Original published format: US 450538 | [2009/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007145981 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2049552 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2049552 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/02 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
C07F7/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2009/31] |
Former [2009/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIREKTEN SYNTHESE VON TRIALKOXYSILAN | [2009/17] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE DIRECT SYNTHESIS OF TRIALKOXYSILANE | [2009/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA SYNTHÈSE DIRECTE DE TRIALCOXYSILANE | [2009/17] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 10.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]JPS5528929 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND) [YD] 5-7,17 * abstract *; | [XY]US2002010354 (BRAND ALEXANDRA [DE]) [X] 32-34 * paragraphs [0025] , [0041] * [Y] 1-4,21,22,25,26,29; | [YD]WO02060909 (CROMPTON CORP [US]) [YD] 1-7,17,21,22,25,26,29 * page 17 - page 27 *; | [PA]US2007060764 (LEWIS KENRICK M [US], et al) [PA] 1-34* the whole document * | by applicant | US3775457 | JPH06306083 | US5527937 | US2002010354 | - OKAMOTO, J. CATALYSIS, (1993), vol. 143, pages 64 - 85 | - J. ORGANOMETALLIC CHEM., (1995), vol. 489, pages C12 - C16 |