EP2067207 - BUTTON ANTENNA FOR HANDHELD DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2018/31] |
Former [2009/24] | For all designated states Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop, M/S:3-Pat Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CABALLERO, Ruben 1 Infinite Loop, M/S 81/1TF Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
DABOV, Teodor 1 Infinite Loop, M/S 305-1PH Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Zhijun East 16, Unit 5, Room 302 Tsinghua University Beijing, 100084 / CN | 04 /
FILSON, John Benjamin 20 Ryland Park Dr. Apt. 316 San Jose CA 95110 / US | 05 /
SANFORD, Emery Artemus 2277 Van Ness Ave. Apt. B San Francisco CA 94109 / US | [2009/33] |
Former [2009/24] | 01 /
CABALLERO, Ruben 1467 Carrington Circle San Jose CA 95125 / US | ||
02 /
DABOV, Teodor 750 N. Shoreline Blvd. Apt. 59 Mountain View CA 94043 / US | |||
03 /
ZHANG, Zhijun 3655 Pruneridge Ave. Apt. 22 Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | |||
04 /
FILSON, John Benjamin 20 Ryland Park Dr. Apt. 316 San Jose CA 95110 / US | |||
05 /
SANFORD, Emery Artemus 2277 Van Ness Ave. Apt. B San Francisco CA 94109 / US | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler, Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07796150.6 | 14.06.2007 | [2009/24] | WO2007US14044 | Priority number, date | US20060527192 | 25.09.2006 Original published format: US 527192 | [2009/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008039255 | Date: | 03.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2067207 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/08, H01Q1/24, H01Q1/44 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
H01Q1/088 (EP,US);
H01Q1/244 (EP,US);
H01Q1/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KNOPFANTENNE FÜR TRAGBARE GERÄTE | [2009/24] | English: | BUTTON ANTENNA FOR HANDHELD DEVICES | [2009/24] | French: | ANTENNE BOUTON POUR DES DISPOSITIFS PORTATIFS | [2009/24] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 21.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0415703 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-35 * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 42; figures 5,6 *; | [X]EP0777296 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [X]US6545642 (DOUB MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2004253927 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM JP) [A] 1-35* the whole document * | Examination | CH673748 | US5374937 |