EP2043727 - DEVICES AND METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF OBESITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vibrynt, Inc. 701 Galveston Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2010/46] |
Former [2009/15] | For all designated states Vibrynt, Inc. 2570 W. El Camino Real Suite 310 Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAKOWER, Joshua 661 University Avenue Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 02 /
KIM, Steven 1969 Farndon Avenue Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 03 /
SHIU, Brian K. 1377 Fisherhawk Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 04 /
UEMURA, Shuji 152 Lombard St. 206 San Francisco, CA 94111 / US | 05 /
ACOSTA, Pablo G. 8272 Rinconada Court Newark, CA 94560 / US | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | Barlocci, Anna, et al ZBM PATENTS Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | Barlocci, Anna, et al ZBM PATENTS Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Pl. Catalunya, 1 08002 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2009/30] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/15] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07797004.4 | 24.07.2007 | [2009/15] | WO2007US16654 | Priority number, date | US20060833284P | 24.07.2006 Original published format: US 833284 P | US20060877595P | 28.12.2006 Original published format: US 877595 P | US20070716986 | 10.03.2007 Original published format: US 716986 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008013814 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2043727 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/00, A61B17/34 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
A61B17/072 (EP,US);
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B17/07292 (EP,US);
A61B17/115 (EP,US);
A61B17/3468 (EP,US);
A61B5/42 (EP,US);
A61F5/003 (EP,US);
A61F5/0033 (EP,US);
A61F5/0073 (EP,US);
A61N1/05 (EP,US);
A61B17/00234 (EP,US);
A61B17/1285 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00278 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00942 (EP,US);
A61B2017/12018 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3484 (EP,US);
A61B5/036 (EP,US);
A61B5/392 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/15] | A61M29/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ADIPOSITAS | [2009/15] | English: | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF OBESITY | [2009/15] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS DESTINÉS AU TRAITEMENT DE L'OBÉSITÉ | [2009/15] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 13.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/28] | 04.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/28] | Divisional application(s) | EP10161737.1 / EP2401991 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2005105003 (SYNECOR LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * figures 13A-F,19 * * page 7, lines 2-23 * * page 8, lines 32-33 * [Y] 4-6; | [Y]US2001049497 (KALLOO ANTHONY NICOLAS [US], et al) [Y] 4-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] - [0050] *; | [A]WO2005018417 (UNIV LOUISIANA STATE [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US6675809 (STACK RICHARD S [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2005105003 | US2001049497 | US6981978 | US6186149 |