EP2029003 - DEVICE FOR LYMPHATIC SYSTEM MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cardiac Pacemakers, Inc. 4100 Hamline Avenue North St. Paul MN 55112-5798 / US | [2009/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHUROS, Allan C. 1121 Colette Place St. Paul, Minnesota 55116 / US | 02 /
KANE, Michael J. 5173 Marquess Trail Lake Elmo, Minnesota 55042 / US | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight BusinessTowers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07797246.1 | 19.04.2007 | [2009/10] | WO2007US66916 | Priority number, date | US20060422417 | 06.06.2006 Original published format: US 422417 | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007146489 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2029003 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/03, A61B5/07, A61N1/365 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
A61B5/03 (EP,US);
A61B5/076 (EP,US);
A61B5/14546 (EP,US);
A61B5/415 (EP,US);
A61B5/418 (EP,US);
A61B5/4839 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DES LYMPHATISCHEN SYSTEMS | [2009/10] | English: | DEVICE FOR LYMPHATIC SYSTEM MONITORING | [2009/10] | French: | APPAREIL DE SURVEILLANCE DU SYSTÈME LYMPHATIQUE | [2009/10] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 20.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/17] | 07.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO2007067690 (UNIV DREXEL [US], et al) [E] 1,2,5,7 * paragraphs [0034] - [0036] - [0058]; figure 1 *; | [XY]WO03098177 (SAVACOR INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-10 * abstract * * page 18, line 5 - page 19, line 11 * * page 27, line 32 - page 28, line 17 * * page 30, line 20 - page 31, line 2 * * page 33, lines 15-30 * [Y] 3,4; | [Y]WO9314694 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]) [Y] 3,4 * abstract * * page 13, lines 3-20 *; | [X]WO2005089863 (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7 * abstract * * page 3, lines 3-5 * * page 10, lines 29-31 * * page 14, lines 17-24 *; | [A]US2005267440 (HERMAN STEPHEN J [US], et al) [A] 2-4 * paragraphs [0115] - [0122] * |