EP2016101 - BINDING POLYPEPTIDES WITH OPTIMIZED SCAFFOLDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco CA 94080-4990 / US | ||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Genentech, Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARTHELEMY, Pierre A. 1400 Floribunda Avenue, Apt. 305 Burlingame, California 94010 / US | 02 /
SIDHU, Sachdev, S. 135 Brunswick Avenue Toronto, Ontario M5S 2M3 / CA | [2009/04] | Representative(s) | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 07797370.9 | 08.05.2007 | [2009/04] | WO2007US68469 | Priority number, date | US20060798812P | 09.05.2006 Original published format: US 798812 P | US20060866370P | 17.11.2006 Original published format: US 866370 P | US20070886994P | 29.01.2007 Original published format: US 886994 P | [2009/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007134050 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2016101 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/32 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
C07K16/005 (EP,US);
C07K16/00 (US);
C07K16/32 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/04] | Extension states | AL | 18.11.2008 | BA | 18.11.2008 | HR | 18.11.2008 | MK | 18.11.2008 | RS | 18.11.2008 | Title | German: | BINDUNG VON POLYPEPTIDEN MIT OPTIMIERTEN GERÜSTEN | [2009/04] | English: | BINDING POLYPEPTIDES WITH OPTIMIZED SCAFFOLDS | [2009/04] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES DE LIAISON À SQUELETTES OPTIMISÉS | [2009/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/04] | 30.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/52] | 13.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006030220 (DOMANTIS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-7,16,17,24,32,33,36,37,61-69 * sequences 9, 21-22, 26, 30-33, 45, 63, 76-77, 80, 285, 288 * * sequences 329, 337, 347, 356 *; | [E]WO2007085815 (DOMANTIS LTD [GB], et al) [E] 1-7,16,17,24,32,33,36,37,61-69 * sequences 175, 176, 180, 190, 191, 199-204 * * sequences 206-222, 225-262, 264-293, 296-309 * * sequences 312-322, 326-330, 332, 334, 342, 346, 2435 * * table 16 *; | [DX] - JESPERS L ET AL, "Crystal Structure of HEL4, a Soluble, Refoldable Human VH Single Domain with a Germ-line Scaffold", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (20040402), vol. 337, no. 4, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 893 - 903, XP004496018 [DX] 1-7,61-69 * page 897, column RIGHT - page 900, column LEFT * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2004.02.013 | [X] - UEDA H ET AL, "Stabilization of antibody VH-domains by proteolytic selection", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS. B, ENZYMATIC, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM,, NL, (2004), vol. 28, ISSN 1381-1177, pages 173 - 179, XP003016163 [X] 1-5,61-69 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcatb.2003.12.018 | [X] - DAVIES J ET AL, "SINGLE ANTIBODY DOMAINS AS SMALL RECOGNITION UNITS: DESIGN AND IN VITRO ANTIGEN SELECTION OF CAMELIZED, HUMAN VH DOMAINS WITH IMPROVED PROTEIN STABILITY", PROTEIN ENGINEERING, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (1996), vol. 9, no. 6, ISSN 0269-2139, pages 531 - 537, XP000971767 [X] 1-7,61-69 * the whole document * | [A] - RUDIKOFF S ET AL, "Single amino acid substitution altering antigen-binding specificity", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (198203), vol. 79, no. 6, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1979 - 1983, XP002986051 [A] 1-7,16,17,24,32,33,36,37 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.79.6.1979 | [A] - WILLUDA J ET AL, "High thermal stability is essential for tumor targeting of antibody fragments: Engineering of a humanized anti-epithelial glycoprotein-2 (epithelial cell adhesion molecule) single-chain Fv fragment", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19991115), vol. 59, no. 22, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 5758 - 5767, XP002249463 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - NIEBA L ET AL, "Disrupting the hydrophobic patches at the antibody variable/constant domain interface: Improved in vivo folding and physical characterization of an engineered scFv fragment", PROTEIN ENGINEERING, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (1997), vol. 10, no. 4, ISSN 0269-2139, pages 435 - 444, XP002249462 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/protein/10.4.435 |