EP2026876 - BUTTON PROCESSOR FOR COCHLEAR IMPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Med-El Elektromedizinische Geräte GmbH Fürstenweg 77a 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2009/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOCHMAIR, Erwin Stadelbach 5 Innsbruck 6094 / AT | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Lucke, Andreas, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | Lucke, Andreas, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/49] | Froud, Clive, et al Clive Froud & Co Limited 7 Hurst Close Tenterden Ashford Kent TN30 6UG / GB | ||
Former [2009/09] | Froud, Clive, et al Clive Froud & Co Limited 7 Hurst Close Tenterden GB-Kent TN30 6UG / GB | Application number, filing date | 07798285.8 | 08.06.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007US70711 | Priority number, date | US20060812431P | 09.06.2006 Original published format: US 812431 P | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007146773 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2026876 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
A61N1/36038 (EP,KR,US);
A61N1/0541 (KR);
A61N1/36128 (KR);
A61N1/37211 (EP,KR,US);
A61N1/375 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KNOPFPROZESSOR FÜR KOCHLEAR-IMPLANTATE | [2009/09] | English: | BUTTON PROCESSOR FOR COCHLEAR IMPLANTS | [2009/09] | French: | PROCESSEUR A BOUTON POUR DES IMPLANTS COCHLEAIRES | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 23.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/04] | 08.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4352960 (DORMER KENNETH J, et al) [X] 1-16 * column 1, line 7 - column 7, line 60; figures 1-4 *; | [X]WO0150816 (HOUSE DAVID WILLIAM [US]) [X] 1-16 * page 1, line 6 - page 9, line 15; figures 1-10 *; | [A]WO0139830 (EPIC BIOSONICS INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 1, line 10 - page 33, line 22; figures 1-18 * |