EP2029223 - APPARATUS FOR MULTI-VESSEL RENAL NEUROMODULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/10] | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR MULTI-VESSEL RENAL NEUROMODULATION | ||
[2018/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic Ardian Luxembourg S.à.r.l. 102 rue des Maraîchers 2124 Luxembourg / LU | [2015/14] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states Ardian, Inc. 1810a Embarcadero Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMARAIS, Denise 15403 Shannon Road Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2019/31] |
Former [2012/33] | Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/32] | Steinbach, Frank, et al Zimmermann & Partner Friedrichstrasse 153a 10117 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2012/13] | Donald, Jenny Susan, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/52] | Donald, Jenny Susan, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/10] | Donald, Jenny Susan Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07798341.9 | 08.06.2007 | [2009/10] | WO2007US70799 | Priority number, date | US20060451728 | 12.06.2006 Original published format: US 451728 | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007146834 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2029223 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2029223 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05, A61N1/32, A61N1/36, A61B18/12, A61B18/14 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
A61N1/36007 (EP,US);
A61B18/1206 (US);
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61N1/05 (EP,US);
A61N1/0551 (EP,US);
A61N1/205 (EP,US);
A61N1/327 (EP,US);
A61N1/3605 (EP,US);
A61N1/36114 (EP,US);
A61N1/36117 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0022 (US);
A61B2018/00267 (US);
A61B2018/00404 (US);
A61B2018/00434 (US);
A61B2018/00511 (US);
A61B2018/00577 (US);
A61B2018/00613 (EP,US);
A61F2007/126 (EP,US);
A61F7/10 (EP,US);
A61N1/0507 (EP,US);
A61N1/0558 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/36] | A61N1/32, A61N1/05, A61N1/36 | ||
Former IPC [2009/10] | A61N1/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/31] |
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR MEHRGEFÄSS-NEUROMODULATION DER NIEREN | [2018/44] | English: | APPARATUS FOR MULTI-VESSEL RENAL NEUROMODULATION | [2018/44] | French: | APPAREIL DE NEUROMODULATION RÉNALE MULTICUVE | [2018/44] |
Former [2009/10] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MEHRGEFÄSS-NEUROMODULATION DER NIEREN | ||
Former [2009/10] | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR MULTI-VESSEL RENAL NEUROMODULATION | ||
Former [2009/10] | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL DE NEUROMODULATION RÉNALE MULTICUVE | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 24.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 02.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.10.2018 | 09.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17163337.3 / EP3205305 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.06.2007 | AT | 31.07.2019 | CY | 31.07.2019 | CZ | 31.07.2019 | DK | 31.07.2019 | EE | 31.07.2019 | FI | 31.07.2019 | IT | 31.07.2019 | LT | 31.07.2019 | LV | 31.07.2019 | MC | 31.07.2019 | MT | 31.07.2019 | PL | 31.07.2019 | RO | 31.07.2019 | SE | 31.07.2019 | SI | 31.07.2019 | SK | 31.07.2019 | TR | 31.07.2019 | IS | 30.10.2019 | BG | 31.10.2019 | GR | 01.11.2019 | PT | 02.12.2019 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/12] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
MC | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SI | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
CZ | 31.07.2019 | ||
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
SK | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
IT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
PL | 31.07.2019 | ||
RO | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
DK | 31.07.2019 | ||
EE | 31.07.2019 | ||
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
TR | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
IS | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
LV | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
GR | 01.11.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 31.07.2019 | |
FI | 31.07.2019 | ||
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
SE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 31.10.2019 | ||
PT | 02.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 31.07.2019 | |
LT | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 31.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006041277 (DEEM MARK [US], et al) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0082] , [0084] , [0088] - [0090] - [0114] - [0116]; figures 1-5, 12-13 * | International search | [Y]US6246912 (SLUIJTER MENNO E [NL], et al); | [X]US2003060858 (KIEVAL ROBERT S [US], et al); | [A]US7162303 (LEVIN HOWARD R [US], et al) | by applicant | US2005288730 | US2006041277 |