EP2032467 - LIQUID DISPENSING SYRINGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nordson Corporation 28601 Clemens Road Westlake, OH 44145 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/33] | For all designated states Nordson Corporation 28601 Clemens Road Westlake, Ohio 44145 / US | ||
Former [2009/11] | For all designated states Nordon Corporation 28601 Clemens Road Westlake, Ohio 44145 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRONG, Warren N. 9 Aster Lane Hope, RI 02831 / US | 02 /
VIDAL, Michael A. 1 Galway Drive North Attleborough, MA 02760 / US | 03 /
WOLDORF, Terrence 144 Mouse Mill Road Westport, MA 02790 / US | [2009/11] | Representative(s) | Andres, Mark Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | Andres, Mark Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07798423.5 | 12.06.2007 | [2009/11] | WO2007US70971 | Priority number, date | US20060813424P | 13.06.2006 Original published format: US 813424 P | [2009/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007146921 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2032467 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2032467 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/00, F16J1/00, A61M3/00 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
F16J1/003 (EP,US);
B65D83/00 (KR);
A61M3/00 (KR);
B05C17/00576 (EP,US);
F16J1/00 (KR);
A61M2005/3104 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3123 (EP,US);
A61M2005/31516 (EP,US);
A61M5/2053 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/28] |
Former [2009/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSAUSGABESPRITZE | [2009/11] | English: | LIQUID DISPENSING SYRINGE | [2009/11] | French: | SERINGUE DE DISTRIBUTION DE LIQUIDE | [2009/11] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 14.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10165573.6 / EP2223868 | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4708270 (RUESCH MERLIN R [US]) [A] 1,32 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2020254 (LAJOVIC D S) [A] 1,32 * the whole document *; | [A]US3237815 (OGLE ROBERT W) [A] 1,32 * the whole document * |