EP2050229 - PAGING OPERATION FOR IDLE MODE TERMINALS WITH A PLURALITY OF WIRELESS INTERFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENKATACHALAM, Muthaiah 1441 NE Carlaby Way Hillsboro, Oregon 97124 / US | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | HGF 8th Floor 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | Clarke, Jeffrey Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07799448.1 | 10.07.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007US73152 | Priority number, date | US20060488814 | 17.07.2006 Original published format: US 488814 | [2009/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008011303 | Date: | 24.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2050229 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04B7/24, H04L29/06, H04W88/06 | [2014/03] | CPC: |
H04W68/12 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/17] | H04L12/28, H04B7/24, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/17] | Title | German: | PAGING-OPERATION FÜR LEERLAUFMODUS-ENDGERÄTE MIT MEHREREN DRAHTLOSEN SCHNITTSTELLEN | [2009/17] | English: | PAGING OPERATION FOR IDLE MODE TERMINALS WITH A PLURALITY OF WIRELESS INTERFACES | [2009/17] | French: | OPÉRATION DE RECHERCHE DE TERMINAUX EN MODE REPOS AVEC UNE PLURALITÉ D'INTERFACES SANS FIL | [2009/17] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 10.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/27] | 27.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2012 | 31.07.2018 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - MUTHIAH VENKATACHALAM, "Media Independent Idle Mode and Paging ; 21-06-0701-00-0000-Media independent idle mode and paging", IEEE DRAFT; 21-06-0701-00-0000-MEDIA INDEPENDENT IDLE MODE AND PAGING, IEEE-SA, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20060501), vol. 802.21, pages 1 - 13, XP017654339 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X] - YUVRAJ AGARWAL ET AL., "Dynamic Power Management using on Demand Paging for Networked Embedded Systems", DESIGN AUTOMATION CONFERENCE, 2005. PROCEEDINGS OF THE ASP-DAC 2005. ASIA AND SOUTH PACIFIC, (20050118), vol. 2, pages 755 - 759, XP010814460 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1120725.1121010 | [X] - PERING T. ET AL., "Reducing the Power Consumption of Wireless Mobile Devices with Multiple Radio Interfaces", MOBISY'06, UPPSALA, SWEDEN, (20060619), XP001541426 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1134680.1134704 |