EP2052547 - DYNAMIC RANGE REDUCTION BEFORE VIDEO ENCODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAVEENDRAN, Vijayalakshmi R. 4272 Calle Mar De Ballenas San Diego, California 92130 / US | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | Loveless, Ian Mark Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07799707.0 | 19.07.2007 | [2009/18] | WO2007US73854 | Priority number, date | US20060832348P | 20.07.2006 Original published format: US 832348 P | US20070779869 | 18.07.2007 Original published format: US 779869 | [2009/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008011502 | Date: | 24.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2052547 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/85, H04N19/176, H04N19/172, H04N19/46, H04N19/30, H04N19/117, H04N19/164, H04N19/17, H04N19/80, H04N19/587, H04N19/86, H04N19/59, G06T5/00, G06T5/40 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
G06T5/40 (EP,US);
H04N19/139 (KR);
G06T5/90 (EP,US);
H04N19/117 (EP,US);
H04N19/164 (EP,US);
H04N19/17 (EP,US);
H04N19/172 (EP,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/30 (EP,US);
H04N19/46 (EP,US);
H04N19/587 (EP,US);
H04N19/59 (EP,US);
H04N19/80 (EP,US);
H04N19/85 (EP,US);
H04N19/86 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/18] | H04N7/26, H04N7/46, G06T5/00, G06T5/40, G06T3/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERMINDERUNG DES DYNAMIKBEREICHES VOR DER VIDEOKODIERUNG | [2019/03] | English: | DYNAMIC RANGE REDUCTION BEFORE VIDEO ENCODING | [2009/18] | French: | RÉDUCTION DE LA GAMME DYNAMIQUE AVANT LE CODAGE VIDÉO | [2019/03] |
Former [2009/18] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KODIERERUNTERSTÜTZTEN VORVERARBEITUNG | ||
Former [2009/18] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DESTINÉS AU PRÉTRAITEMENT ASSISTÉ PAR ENCODEUR | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 03.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/45] | 21.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1215909 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1-8,13-17,22-27,29-34 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0118]; figures 6-10 *; | [X]WO02089060 (APICAL LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,9,11,13,14,22-24,29-31 * page 25, line 7 - page 26, line 7 * * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 15 *; | [XY]US6560285 (REITMEIER GLENN ARTHUR [US], et al) [X] 1-11,13-20,22-35 * abstract * * column 1, line 30 - line 53 * * column 3, line 23 - column 6, line 9; figures 1,2 * * column 7, line 23 - column 10, line 30 * * column 10, line 60 - column 13, line 3; figure 5 * [Y] 12,21; | [A]US6909745 (PURI ATUL [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * column 6, line 65 - column 8, line 32; figure 3 * * column 16, line 37 - column 17, line 11; figure 10 *; | [A]WO2005057933 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-35 * page 4, line 11 - page 7, line 4; figures 2a,2b,3,4 *; | [Y] - KEH-SHIH CHUANG ET AL, "Thresholding Histogram Equalization", JOURNAL OF DIGITAL IMAGING ; THE JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY FOR COMPUTER APPLICATIONS IN RADIOLOGY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NE, (20011201), vol. 14, no. 4, ISSN 1618-727X, pages 182 - 185, XP019445727 [Y] 12,21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10278-001-0103-z | [A] - DOUGLAS CHAI ET AL, "Transactions PapersFace Segmentation Using Skin-Color Map in Videophone Applications", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (199906), vol. 9, no. 4, ISSN 1051-8215, XP011014577 [A] 1-35 * abstract * * Section I, pages 551-552 * * figure 5 * * Section III.E, page 558 with figures 13 and 14 * | [A] - SCHRODER H, "Image processing for TV-receiver applications", IMAGE PROCESSING AND ITS APPLICATIONS, 1992., INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MAASTRICHT, NETHERLANDS, LONDON, UK,IEE, UK, (1992), ISBN 0-85296-543-5, pages 1 - 8, XP006500107 [A] 1-35 * table 1 * * Section 3.2, pages 6-7 * |