EP2056861 - VACCINE IMMUNOTHERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IRX Therapeutics, Inc. 140 West 57th Street, Suite 9C New York, NY 10019 / US | [2009/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HADDEN, John, W. 428 Harbor Road Cold Spring Harbor, NY 11724 / US | 02 /
SIGNORELLI, Kathy 15 Ginger Bread Road Kings Park, NY 11754 / US | 03 /
EGAN, James 1 Bioscience Park Drive Farmingdale, NY 11735 / US | [2009/20] | Representative(s) | Austin, Hedley William Chapman IP Cardiff Business Technology Centre Senghennydd Road Cardiff CF24 4AY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | Austin, Hedley William Chapman Molony Cardiff Business Technology Centre Senghennydd Road Cardiff CF24 4AY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07799769.0 | 24.07.2007 | [2009/20] | WO2007US74156 | Priority number, date | US20060492418 | 25.07.2006 Original published format: US 492418 | [2009/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008014220 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2056861 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/20, A61K38/19, A61K45/00, A61P37/04 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
A61K38/217 (EP,US);
A61K39/0011 (EP,US);
A61K38/191 (EP,US);
A61K38/2006 (EP,US);
A61K38/2013 (EP,US);
A61K38/204 (EP,US);
A61K38/2053 (EP,US);
A61K39/001195 (EP,US);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/14 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/06 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/191, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/2006, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/2013, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/204, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2009/20] | A61K38/20, A61K38/19, A61K45/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPF-IMMUNTHERAPIE | [2009/20] | English: | VACCINE IMMUNOTHERAPY | [2009/20] | French: | IMMUNOTHÉRAPIE PAR VACCIN | [2009/20] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 23.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/43] | 17.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/43] | Divisional application(s) | EP13188131.0 / EP2684569 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.01.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 26.02.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 26.02.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.04.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.01.2010 | 31.07.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.01.2011 | 31.07.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   19.10.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0234119 (IMMUNO RX INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * [0072]; column 2, line 11 - line 40 *; | [I]WO03035004 (IMMUNO RX INC [US], et al) [I] 1-4 * page 8, line 7 - line 14 * * page 11, line 30 - page 12, line 4 * * the whole document *; | [A] - NAYLOR PAUL H ET AL, "T cell targeted immune enhancement yields effective T cell adjuvants", INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030801), vol. 3, no. 8, doi:10.1016/S1567-5769(03)00025-0, ISSN 1567-5769, pages 1205 - 1215, XP002442180 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1567-5769(03)00025-0 | [A] - BARRERA J L ET AL, "Combination immunotherapy of squamous cell carcinoma of the head and neck", ARCHIVES OF OTOLARYNGOLOGY HEAD AND NECK SURGERY, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, US, (20000301), vol. 126, no. 3, ISSN 0886-4470, pages 345 - 351, XP002967974 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US6977072 (HADDEN JOHN W [US]) |