EP2049633 - MANNICH POST-TREATMENT OF PIBSA DISPERSANTS FOR IMPROVED DISPERSION OF EGR SOOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Lubrizol Corporation 29400 Lakeland Blvd. Wickliffe OH 44092-2298 / US | [2009/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIESELMAN, Matthew, D. 29400 Lakeland Blvd. Wickliffe, Ohio 44092-2298 / US | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2009/17] | Bradley, Josephine Mary D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07799966.2 | 01.08.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007US74959 | Priority number, date | US20060821281P | 03.08.2006 Original published format: US 821281 P | [2009/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008016967 | Date: | 07.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2049633 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C10M159/12, C10M159/16, C10M133/56, C10M149/14, C10M149/16, C10M177/00, C10N30/04, C10N30/10, C10N40/25, C10N60/00, C10N70/00 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
C10M159/12 (EP,US);
C10M133/56 (EP,US);
C10M149/14 (EP,US);
C10M149/16 (EP,US);
C10M159/16 (EP,US);
C10M177/00 (EP,US);
C10M2207/08 (EP,US);
C10M2209/086 (EP,US);
C10M2215/06 (EP,US);
C10M2215/062 (EP,US);
C10M2215/064 (EP,US);
C10M2215/066 (EP,US);
C10M2215/086 (EP,US);
C10M2215/28 (EP,US);
C10M2217/042 (EP,US);
C10M2217/043 (EP,US);
C10N2030/04 (EP,US);
C10N2030/041 (EP,US);
C10N2030/10 (EP,US);
C10N2040/25 (EP,US);
C10N2040/252 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/35] |
Former [2009/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MANNICH-NACHBEHANDLUNG VON PIBSA-DISPERSIONSMITTELN FÜR VERBESSERTE DISPERSION VON EGR-RUSS | [2009/17] | English: | MANNICH POST-TREATMENT OF PIBSA DISPERSANTS FOR IMPROVED DISPERSION OF EGR SOOT | [2009/17] | French: | POST-TRAITEMENT DE MANNICH DE DISPERSANTS À BASE D'ANHYDRIDE SUCCINIQUE DE POLYISOBUTÉNYLE (PIBSA) POUR UNE DISPERSION AMÉLIORÉE DE LA SUIE PROVENANT DES GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT (EGR) | [2009/17] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 09.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/31] | 26.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4248725 (CRAWFORD JOHN, et al) [X] 1,3-5,7-16,18 * column 1, lines 10-14 * * column 2, lines 1-10 * * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 26 * * column 7, lines 18-21; claims 1,3,6 *; | [XD]US5102570 (MIGDAL CYRIL A [US], et al) [XD] 1,3-5,7-16,18 * column 1, line 19; example - *; | [X]US5256325 (EMERT JACOB [US], et al) [X] 1-12,15-18 * column 24, lines 10-34 * * column 28, line 53 - column 32, line 50 * |