EP2064653 - METHOD AND SYSTEM OF IDENTIFYING ONE OR MORE FEATURES REPRESENTED IN A PLURALITY OF SENSOR ACQUIRED DATA SETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensen Networks Pty Ltd Unit 4 71 Victoria Crescent Abbotsford VIC 3067 / AU | [2015/48] |
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states Sensen Networks Pty Ltd Suite 14 Bulleen Corporate Centre 79 Manningham Road Bulleen, VIC 3105 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHALLA, Subhash Suite 2, Bulleen Plaza 79-109 Manningham Road Bulleen, Melbourne VIC 3105 / AU | [2009/23] | Representative(s) | Small, Gary James, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Small, Gary James, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07800232.6 | 31.08.2007 | [2009/23] | WO2007AU01274 | Priority number, date | AU20060904797 | 01.09.2006 Original published format: AU 2006904797 | [2009/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008025092 | Date: | 06.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2064653 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 06.03.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06T1/40, G06K9/32 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
G06V20/63 (EP,US);
G06F18/256 (EP,US);
G06V10/811 (EP,US);
G06V20/625 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/23] | G06K9/00, G06T1/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM IDENTIFIZIEREN EINES ODER MEHRERER IN MEHREREN SENSORBESCHAFFTEN DATENSÄTZEN REPRÄSENTIERTER MERKMALE | [2009/23] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM OF IDENTIFYING ONE OR MORE FEATURES REPRESENTED IN A PLURALITY OF SENSOR ACQUIRED DATA SETS | [2009/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'IDENTIFICATION D'AU MOINS UN ÉLÉMENT REPRÉSENTÉ DANS UNE PLURALITÉ DE FICHIERS ACQUIS AU MOYEN DE CAPTEURS | [2009/23] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 28.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/31] | 28.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2010 | 31.08.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2011 | 31.08.2017 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - ZHI-BIN HUANG ET AL, "Classifier fusion-based vehicle license plate detection algorithm", MACHINE LEARNING AND CYBERNETICS, 2003 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON NOV. 2-5, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20031102), vol. 5, doi:10.1109/ICMLC.2003.1260086, ISBN 978-0-7803-7865-0, pages 2984 - 2989, XP010682225 [X] 1-15 * Section 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICMLC.2003.1260086 | [X] - KOVAL V ET AL, "Smart license plate recognition system based on image processing using neural network", INTELLIGENT DATA ACQUISITION AND ADVANCED COMPUTING SYSTEMS: TECHNOLOG Y AND APPLICATIONS, 2003. PROCEEDINGS OF THE SECOND IEEE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON SEPT. 8-10, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20030908), doi:10.1109/IDAACS.2003.1249531, ISBN 978-0-7803-8138-4, pages 123 - 127, XP010671641 [X] 1-15 * Section 2, 3, 4, 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IDAACS.2003.1249531 | [X] - ARR G S ET AL, "Vehicle Reidentification Using Multidetector Fusion", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INTELLIGENT TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20040901), vol. 5, no. 3, doi:10.1109/TITS.2004.833770, ISSN 1524-9050, pages 155 - 164, XP011118373 [X] 1-15 * Section III, Section IV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TITS.2004.833770 | [X] - PALIY I ET AL, "Approach to recognition of license plate numbers using neural networks", NEURAL NETWORKS, 2004. PROCEEDINGS. 2004 IEEE INTERNATIONAL JOINT CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20040725), vol. 4, doi:10.1109/IJCNN.2004.1381137, ISBN 978-0-7803-8359-3, pages 2965 - 2970, XP010759436 [X] 1-15 * Section 2, 3, 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IJCNN.2004.1381137 | [AP] - RAMI AL-HMOUZ ET AL, "License plate localization based on a probabilistic model", MACHINE VISION AND APPLICATIONS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20080930), vol. 21, no. 3, ISSN 1432-1769, pages 319 - 330, XP019797438 [AP] 1-15 * the whole document * | [X] - KIM K K ET AL, "Learning-based approach for license plate recognition", NEURAL NETWORKS FOR SIGNAL PROCESSING X, 2000. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2000 IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING SOCIETY WORKSHOP DECEMBER 11-13, 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20001211), vol. 2, doi:10.1109/NNSP.2000.890140, ISBN 978-0-7803-6278-9, pages 614 - 623, XP010526408 [X] 1-15 * Section 2.2 and 2.3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NNSP.2000.890140 | International search | [A] - ATREY ET AL., "Probability Fusion for Correlated Multimedia Streams", MM 04, NEW YORK, NY, (20041010), pages 408 - 411, XP008105140 | [A] - O'BRIEN J., "Correlated Probability Fusion for Multiple Class Discrimination", (1999), pages 571 - 577, XP010325245 | [A] - TURCHENKO ET AL., "Smart Vehicle Screening System using Artificial Intelligence Methods", 2003 SPRING IEEE CONFERENCE ON TECHNOLOGIES FOR HOMELAND SECURITY, CAMBRIDGE, MA, USA, (20030507), XP008105094 | [AP] - LAMOSA F. ET AL., "Vehicle Detection Using Probability Fusion Maps Generated by a Multi-Camera System", IEIC TECHNICAL REPORT (INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS), (2007), vol. 106, no. 448, pages 51 - 58, XP008105095 | Examination | US2005029347 | - CHEN D ET AL, "Video text recognition using sequential Monte Carlo and error voting methods", PATTERN RECOGNITION LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 26, no. 9, ISSN 0167-8655, (20050701), pages 1386 - 1403, (20050701), XP027779811 | - RAHMAN A F R ET AL, "Multiple classifier decision combination strategies for character recognition: a review", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF DOCUMENT ANALYSIS AND RECOGNITION (IJDAR), SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20030606), vol. 5, doi:10.1007/S10032-002-0090-8, ISSN 1433-2825, pages 166 - 194, XP002441331 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10032-002-0090-8 | - SHAPIRO V ET AL, "Multinational license plate recognition system:segmentation and classification", PATTERN RECOGNITION, 2004. ICPR 2004. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 17TH INTERNAT IONAL CONFERENCE ON CAMBRIDGE, UK AUG. 23-26, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA, (20040823), vol. 4, doi:10.1109/ICPR.2004.1333775, ISBN 978-0-7695-2128-2, pages 352 - 355, XP010723933 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICPR.2004.1333775 |