EP2037633 - A PROCESSING METHOD,SYSTEM AND DEVICE OF INVALIDATION OF DOWNLINK DATA TUNNEL AMONG NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong Province 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Weihua Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2011/43] |
Former [2009/12] | 01 /
HU, Weihua Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/43] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/12] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07800951.1 | 14.08.2007 | [2009/12] | WO2007CN70475 | Priority number, date | CN200610115276 | 15.08.2006 Original published format: CN200610115276 | [2009/12] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008019627 | Date: | 21.02.2008 | Language: | ZH | [2008/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2037633 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2037633 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/46 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
H04L12/4633 (EP,US);
H04W76/11 (US);
H04W76/12 (EP,US);
H04W76/19 (EP,US);
H04L69/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND GERÄT ZUM ABBRUCH EINES DOWNLINKDATENTUNNELS ZWISCHEN NETZWERKEN | [2009/12] | English: | A PROCESSING METHOD,SYSTEM AND DEVICE OF INVALIDATION OF DOWNLINK DATA TUNNEL AMONG NETWORKS | [2009/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INVALIDATION D'UN TUNNEL DE DONNÉES INTER-RÉSEAUX EN LIAISON DESCENDANTE | [2009/12] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2009 | Translation filed | 28.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 15.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.08.2007 | AT | 26.10.2011 | BE | 26.10.2011 | CY | 26.10.2011 | CZ | 26.10.2011 | DK | 26.10.2011 | EE | 26.10.2011 | IT | 26.10.2011 | LT | 26.10.2011 | LV | 26.10.2011 | MT | 26.10.2011 | NL | 26.10.2011 | PL | 26.10.2011 | RO | 26.10.2011 | SI | 26.10.2011 | SK | 26.10.2011 | TR | 26.10.2011 | BG | 26.01.2012 | GR | 27.01.2012 | IS | 26.02.2012 | PT | 27.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
TR | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 26.10.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2008080717 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [E] 1-17 * abstract * * page 4, line 24 - page 8, line L *; | [PX] - HUAWEI, "One Solution to Error Indication for SGSN controlled bearer optimisation", 3GPP DRAFT; S2-062756, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20060818), vol. SA WG2, no. Sophia; 20060901, XP050256739 [PX] 1-17 * the whole document * | [T] - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; General Packet Radio Service (GPRS); Service description; Stage 2 (Release 7) - 3GPP TS 23.060 V 7.3.0", 3GPP, Sophia Antipolis, Valbonne, France, (20061201), XP002532865 [T] 1-17 * 13.8 Recovery and Restoration Procedures * * 15.6 Direct Tunnel Fuctionality * | International search | [A]US2003021256 (LEE JUNG-SUP [KR]); | [Y]US7054945 (HURTTA TUIJA [FI], et al); | [Y] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and Sytsem Aspects; One Tunnel Functional description; (Release 7)", 3GPP TR 23.809 V0.3.0, (20060731), pages 26 - 27, XP002493526 | by applicant | TR23809V030 | US7054945 |