EP2056959 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SETTING THE TEMPERATURE PROFILE OF A CATALYST IN A REFORMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enerday GmbH Speicherstrasse 3 17033 Neubrandenburg / DE | [2009/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDERMEIR, Andreas Am Kirschenbrink 9 38642 Goslar/Oker / DE | [2009/26] |
Former [2009/20] | 01 /
LINDERMEIR, Andreas Wolfswinkelstrasse 22 17034 Neubrandenburg / DE | Representative(s) | Schumacher, Dirk Schumacher & Willsau Patentanwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Strasse 42 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | Schumacher, Dirk Schumacher & Willsau Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Nymphenburger Strasse 42 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07801135.0 | 10.07.2007 | [2009/20] | WO2007DE01225 | Priority number, date | DE20061040563 | 30.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006040563 | [2009/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008025314 | Date: | 06.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2056959 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/02 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
B01J8/0214 (EP,US);
B01J8/0278 (EP,US);
B01J8/0285 (EP,US);
C01B3/382 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00061 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00309 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00548 (EP,US);
B01J2219/002 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00218 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00231 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0244 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0844 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM EINSTELLEN DES TEMPERATURPROFILS EINES KATALYSATORS IN EINEM REFORMER | [2009/20] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR SETTING THE TEMPERATURE PROFILE OF A CATALYST IN A REFORMER | [2009/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR RÉGLER LE PROFIL DE TEMPÉRATURE D'UN CATALYSEUR DANS UN REFORMEUR | [2009/20] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 20.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/05] | 08.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6348278 (LAPIERRE RENE B [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 16, line 20 - column 18, line 5; figure 3 *; | [X]US2003233789 (DAUER KENNETH J [US], et al) [X] 1-9* paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0020]; figure 2 *; | [X]WO2006060999 (WEBASTO AG FAHRZEUGTECHNIK [DE], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document * |