EP2066467 - METHOD FOR THE CONTINUOUS CASTING OF A METAL STRAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Siemag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2009/25] |
Former [2009/24] | For all designated states SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIRGENSOHN, Albrecht Weststrasse 15 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
SCHAPS, Lothar Schierwaldenrather Strasse 45 52525 Heinsberg / DE | 03 /
PLOCIENNIK, Uwe Noldenkothen 21 40882 Ratingen / DE | [2009/24] | Representative(s) | Klüppel, Walter Hemmerich & Kollegen Patentanwälte Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | Klüppel, Walter Hemmerich & Kollegen Patentanwälte Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07801668.0 | 16.08.2007 | [2009/24] | WO2007EP07204 | Priority number, date | DE20061043797 | 19.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006043797 | [2009/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008034500 | Date: | 27.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2066467 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2066467 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/08, B22D11/20 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
B22D11/208 (EP,KR,US);
B22D11/08 (EP,KR,US);
B22D11/0628 (KR);
B22D11/081 (EP,KR,US);
G01B11/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM STRANGGIESSEN EINES METALLSTRANGES | [2009/24] | English: | METHOD FOR THE CONTINUOUS CASTING OF A METAL STRAND | [2009/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'EXTRUSION D'UNE BARRE MÉTALLIQUE | [2009/24] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 09.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.03.2010 | CZ | 24.03.2010 | DK | 24.03.2010 | EE | 24.03.2010 | FI | 24.03.2010 | IE | 24.03.2010 | LT | 24.03.2010 | LV | 24.03.2010 | MT | 24.03.2010 | NL | 24.03.2010 | PL | 24.03.2010 | RO | 24.03.2010 | SE | 24.03.2010 | SI | 24.03.2010 | SK | 24.03.2010 | TR | 24.03.2010 | BG | 24.06.2010 | GR | 25.06.2010 | IS | 24.07.2010 | PT | 26.07.2010 | LU | 16.08.2010 | BE | 31.08.2010 | FR | 31.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | HU | 25.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 24.03.2010 | |
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
MT | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
LU | 16.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
FR | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
HU | 25.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 24.03.2010 | |
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
MT | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
FR | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
HU | 25.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 24.03.2010 | |
CZ | 24.03.2010 | ||
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
MT | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
FR | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CZ | 24.03.2010 | |
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
MT | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
FR | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CZ | 24.03.2010 | |
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
FR | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/34] | CZ | 24.03.2010 | |
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
IT | 16.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.08.2010 | ||
FR | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | CZ | 24.03.2010 | |
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
IT | 16.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CZ | 24.03.2010 | |
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
PT | 26.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | FI | 24.03.2010 | |
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
NL | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | FI | 24.03.2010 | |
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3983631 (DUTZLER WILHELM) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]JPS5568162 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0014862 (CONCAST AG [CH]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]JPS5788958 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]JPS62207550 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]JPH10185505 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [DX]EP1486275 (SMS DEMAG AG [DE]) [DX] 1-3,10 * paragraph [0003] *; | [DX]EP1543900 (SMS DEMAG AG [DE]) [DX] 1-3,10 * paragraph [0004] *; | [X]KR20050065730 (RES INST IND SCIENCE & TECH [KR]) [X] 1-4,8,10 * the whole document *; | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 41, Database accession no. 2006-399793, XP002457594 |