EP2059918 - DEVICE FOR DISPLAYING SIGNAGE, SUCH AS IN PARTICULAR ADVERTISING SHEET OR THE LIKE, ON SHELVING IN A SALES AREA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Joalpe Industria de Expositores, S.A. Zona Industrial do Tortosendo, Lote 43 6200 Tortosendo / PT | [2009/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALVES, Manuel Rua F, 170 Urbanizaçäo Belo Zezere 6200 Tortosendo / PT | 02 /
DINIS, Pedro Quinta da Cruz 6200-785 Tortosendo / PT | 03 /
CASEIRO, Rosa Rua Jornal do Fundäo Edificcio Praça Velha, 3a 6200 FUNDÄO / PT | [2009/21] | Representative(s) | Boubal, Denis Henri Jacques, et al Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 31, rue des Poissonceaux CS 40009 59044 Lille Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | Boubal, Denis Henri Jacques, et al Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 96/98, Boulevard Carnot B.P. 105 59027 Lille Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2010/51] | Duthoit, Michel Georges André Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 96/98, Boulevard Carnot B.P. 105 59027 Lille Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/21] | Duthoit, Michel Georges André Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 96/98, boulevard Carnot B.P. 105 59027 Lille Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07801789.4 | 21.08.2007 | [2009/21] | WO2007EP07353 | Priority number, date | FR20060007778 | 05.09.2006 Original published format: FR 0607778 | [2009/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008028562 | Date: | 13.03.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2059918 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2059918 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/20, G09F7/20 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
G09F3/204 (EP,US);
G09F7/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANZEIGE EINER BESCHILDERUNG WIE ETWA EINES WERBESCHILDES ODER DERGLEICHEN AUF REGALEN IN EINEM VERKAUFSBEREICH | [2009/21] | English: | DEVICE FOR DISPLAYING SIGNAGE, SUCH AS IN PARTICULAR ADVERTISING SHEET OR THE LIKE, ON SHELVING IN A SALES AREA | [2009/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LA PRÉSENTATION D'UNE SIGNALÉTIQUE, TELLE QUE NOTAMMENT FEUILLE PUBLICITAIRE OU SIMILAIRE, SUR UNE ÉTAGÈRE D'UNE SURFACE DE VENTE | [2009/21] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/21] | 29.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.12.2010 | CY | 22.12.2010 | CZ | 22.12.2010 | DK | 22.12.2010 | EE | 22.12.2010 | FI | 22.12.2010 | HU | 22.12.2010 | IE | 22.12.2010 | LT | 22.12.2010 | LV | 22.12.2010 | MT | 22.12.2010 | NL | 22.12.2010 | RO | 22.12.2010 | SE | 22.12.2010 | SI | 22.12.2010 | SK | 22.12.2010 | TR | 22.12.2010 | BG | 22.03.2011 | GR | 23.03.2011 | ES | 02.04.2011 | IS | 22.04.2011 | PT | 22.04.2011 | LU | 21.08.2011 | BE | 31.08.2011 | CH | 31.08.2011 | LI | 31.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
TR | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
LU | 21.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
LU | 21.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
NL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DA]FR2851363 (DRIVER [FR]) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1560189 (DRIVER [FR]) [A] 1-10* abstract * |