EP2059495 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ALKYLENE OXIDE ADDITION PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2009/21] | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANZEN, Stefan Lünener Strasse 148a 59174 Kamen / DE | 02 /
GUTSCHE, Bernhard Am Kalstert 96 40724 Hilden / DE | 03 /
FABRY, Bernd Bruchstrasse 13 41352 Korschenbroich / DE | 04 /
MAHNKE, Eike, Ulf Theodor-Körner-Strasse 18 42553 Velbert / DE | [2009/21] | Representative(s) | Reinhardt, Jürgen Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | Fabry, Bernd, et al IP2 Intellectual Property Bruchstrasse 13 41352 Korschenbroich / DE | Application number, filing date | 07801953.6 | 29.08.2007 | [2009/21] | WO2007EP07531 | Priority number, date | DE20061041903 | 07.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006041903 | [2009/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008028587 | Date: | 13.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2059495 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2059495 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07C41/03, C07C43/11, C07C67/26, C07C213/04, C07D301/10, C08G65/26 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
C07C41/03 (EP,US);
C07D301/10 (EP,US);
C08G65/2603 (EP,US);
C08G65/2609 (EP,US);
C08G65/2696 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C41/03, C07C43/11 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ALKYLENOXIDANLAGERUNGSPRODUKTEN | [2009/21] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING ALKYLENE OXIDE ADDITION PRODUCTS | [2009/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DES PRODUITS D'ADDITION D'OXYDES D'ALKYLÈNE | [2009/21] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/21] | 11.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 24.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 30.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.08.2007 | CY | 29.02.2012 | CZ | 29.02.2012 | DK | 29.02.2012 | EE | 29.02.2012 | FI | 29.02.2012 | IE | 29.02.2012 | LT | 29.02.2012 | LV | 29.02.2012 | MT | 29.02.2012 | PL | 29.02.2012 | RO | 29.02.2012 | SE | 29.02.2012 | SI | 29.02.2012 | SK | 29.02.2012 | TR | 29.02.2012 | BG | 29.05.2012 | GR | 30.05.2012 | IS | 29.06.2012 | PT | 29.06.2012 | LU | 29.08.2012 | AT | 31.08.2012 | BE | 31.08.2012 | CH | 31.08.2012 | LI | 31.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
TR | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
LU | 29.08.2012 | ||
AT | 31.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
TR | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
AT | 31.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
AT | 31.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
AT | 31.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/27] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 29.02.2012 | |
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 29.02.2012 | |
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 29.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1462446 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0003] , [0034] *; | [Y]EP1586372 (GOLDSCHMIDT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-35 * examples 1a,3-6 * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0067] *; | [YD] - H. KESTENBAUM, A. LANGE DE OLIVEIRA, W. SCHMIDT, F. SCHÜTH, W. EHRFELD, K. GEBAUER, H. LÖWE, T. RICHTER, D. LEBIEDZ ET AL., "Silver-Catalyzed Oxidation of Ethylene Oxide in a Microreaction System", IND. ENG. CHEM. RES., (2002), vol. 41, pages 710 - 719, XP002462405 [YD] 1-35 * abstract * * page 718, paragraph 2 * * page 710, paragraph 5 * * page 711, paragraph 2 * * page 713, paragraph 1; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ie010306u | by applicant | EP0903174 | DE10036602 | EP1586372 | - CHEM. RES., (2005), vol. 25, pages 9482 - 9489 | - JÄHNISCH ET AL., ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, (2004), vol. 116, pages 410 - 451 | - JAMES ET AL., SCI. AM., (1993), vol. 4, page 248 | - SCHÜTH ET AL., IND. ENG. CHEM. RES, (2002), vol. 41, pages 701 - 719 |