EP2064391 - OSCILLATION EXCITER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker Neuson Produktion GmbH & Co. KG Preußenstrasse 41 80809 München / DE | [2011/52] |
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states Wacker Neuson SE Preußenstrasse 41 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AWRATH, Martin Hansastr. 110 81373 München / DE | [2009/23] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07802157.3 | 05.09.2007 | [2009/23] | WO2007EP07752 | Priority number, date | DE20061041784 | 06.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006041784 | [2009/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008028652 | Date: | 13.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2064391 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E01C19/28, E01C19/38, E02D3/074, B06B1/16 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
E01C19/38 (EP,US);
B06B1/161 (EP,US);
E02D3/074 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI, SE [2009/25] |
Former [2009/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWINGUNGSERREGER | [2009/23] | English: | OSCILLATION EXCITER | [2009/23] | French: | GÉNÉRATEUR D'OSCILLATIONS | [2009/23] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 07.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.05.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 03.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/47] | 07.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2099414 (FMC CORP) [Y] 1-8,11-16,18,20 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3746149 (SCHRADER P) [Y] 1-8,11-16,18,20* column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 59 *; | [X]WO0244475 (HAMM AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,9,10,16-18,22-24 * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 4 * * page 6, paragraph 4 - page 10, paragraph 1 * |