EP2036252 - METHOD OF CONFIGURING A MULTI-NETWORK TERMINAL AND ASSOCIATED MULTI-NETWORK TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/32] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states France Télécom 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUVRAY, Vincent 1452, rue du Val Avril 50460 Tonneville / FR | 02 /
BAUBAN, Patrick 19, rue Domremy APT D 56 F-75013 Paris / FR | [2009/12] | Application number, filing date | 07803890.8 | 19.06.2007 | [2009/12] | WO2007FR51463 | Priority number, date | FR20060052764 | 03.07.2006 Original published format: FR 0652764 | [2009/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008003882 | Date: | 10.01.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2036252 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2036252 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
H04W4/24 (EP,US);
H04L41/052 (EP,US);
H04W48/18 (EP,US);
H04M2215/2026 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONFIGURATION EINES MULTINETZWERK-ENDGERÄTES UND ENTSPRECHENDES MULTINETZWERK-ENDGERÄT | [2009/12] | English: | METHOD OF CONFIGURING A MULTI-NETWORK TERMINAL AND ASSOCIATED MULTI-NETWORK TERMINAL | [2009/12] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONFIGURATION D'UN TERMINAL MULTI RESEAUX ET TERMINAL MULTI-RESEAUX ASSOCIE | [2009/12] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 02.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.06.2007 | AT | 10.08.2011 | CY | 10.08.2011 | CZ | 10.08.2011 | DK | 10.08.2011 | EE | 10.08.2011 | FI | 10.08.2011 | IE | 10.08.2011 | IT | 10.08.2011 | LT | 10.08.2011 | LV | 10.08.2011 | MT | 10.08.2011 | NL | 10.08.2011 | PL | 10.08.2011 | RO | 10.08.2011 | SE | 10.08.2011 | SI | 10.08.2011 | SK | 10.08.2011 | TR | 10.08.2011 | BG | 10.11.2011 | GR | 11.11.2011 | ES | 21.11.2011 | IS | 10.12.2011 | PT | 12.12.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IE | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
MT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
TR | 10.08.2011 | ||
BG | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
ES | 21.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IE | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
MT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
BG | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
ES | 21.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IE | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
BG | 10.11.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
ES | 21.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IE | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
ES | 21.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
DK | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IE | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
EE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IE | 10.08.2011 | ||
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
RO | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
SK | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IE | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
IE | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 10.08.2011 | |
CY | 10.08.2011 | ||
FI | 10.08.2011 | ||
LT | 10.08.2011 | ||
LV | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
PL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
SI | 10.08.2011 | ||
GR | 11.11.2011 | ||
IS | 10.12.2011 | ||
PT | 12.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006120329 (KIM JAE-PYEONG [KR], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0077]; figure 3 *; | [A] - HAO-HUA CHU ET AL, Challenges: wireless web services, PARALLEL AND DISTRIBUTED SYSTEMS, 2004. ICPADS 2004. PROCEEDINGS. TENTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON NEWPORT BEACH, CA, USA 7-9 JULY 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, PAGE(S) 657-664, (20040707), ISBN 0-7695-2152-5, XP010710658 [A] 1,4,6,7 * page 4 * * page 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICPADS.2004.1316152 | [A] - RUIZ P M ET AL, Adaptive multimedia multi-party communication in ad hoc environments, SYSTEM SCIENCES, 2004. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 37TH ANNUAL HAWAII INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON 5-8 JAN. 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, PAGE(S) 293-302, (20040105), ISBN 0-7695-2056-1, XP010682893 [A] 1,4,6,7 * page 6, column L, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/HICSS.2004.1265691 |