EP2057458 - A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING PROPERTIES OF BIOLOGICAL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2009/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUIPER, Stein c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
DEN TOONDER, Jacob, M., J. c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2009/20] | Representative(s) | van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 07805434.3 | 17.08.2007 | [2009/20] | WO2007IB53283 | Priority number, date | EP20060119307 | 22.08.2006 Original published format: EP 06119307 | [2009/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008023310 | Date: | 28.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2057458 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/02 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
G01N33/5026 (EP,US);
C12Q1/04 (EP,US);
C12Q1/24 (EP,US);
G01N15/0227 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER EIGENSCHAFTEN BIOLOGISCHER ZELLEN | [2009/20] | English: | A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING PROPERTIES OF BIOLOGICAL CELLS | [2009/20] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER LES PROPRIETES DE CELLULES BIOLOGIQUES | [2009/20] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 05.01.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5376878 (FISHER TIMOTHY C [US]) [X] 1,14,19,22-25 * abstract *; | [X]GB2163555 (DESCARTES UNIVERSITE RENE) [X] 1,14,19,22-25 * abstract * | [X] - Journal of Biomedical Engineering UK, (199111), vol. 13, no. 6, ISSN 0141-5425, pages 503 - 506, XP002465895 [X] 1,6-8,10,12-14,19,21-25 * page 503 - page 504 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0141-5425(91)90099-S | [A] - BIOPHYS. J., (197811), pages 463 - 487, XP008087800 [A] 1-25 * page 470 - page 472 * | [X] - TRACEY M C, "A blood cell deformability detector: the application of microfluidic flow cells in a blood rheology analyser", CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS IEE, (1996), pages 3 - 1, XP006530549 [X] 1,14,19,22-25 * the whole document * |