EP2073735 - DEVICE FOR COMBINED TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/27] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR COMBINED TREATMENT | ||
[2010/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arbel Medical Ltd. P.O. Box 620 20692 Yokenam / IL | [2009/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOUBIA, Didier 11/6 Hagdud Haivri 43559 Ra'anana / IL | 02 /
LEVIN, Alexander 5a Shvil Hachalav 30500 Binyamina / IL | 03 /
KAGANOVICH, Miron 12 Aba Hilel Silver Street 31999 Haifa / IL | 04 /
EYAL-WALDMAN, Lilach Moshav Meishar 21 P.O. Box 208 76850 Moshav Meishar / IL | [2009/27] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Messulam, Alec Moses A. Messulam & Co. Ltd. 43-45 High Road Bushey Heath Hertfordshire WD23 1EE / GB | Application number, filing date | 07805563.9 | 06.09.2007 | [2009/27] | WO2007IL01103 | Priority number, date | US20060824967P | 08.09.2006 Original published format: US 824967 P | [2009/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008029408 | Date: | 13.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2073735 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2073735 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/02 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
A61B18/02 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0262 (EP,US);
A61M2005/341 (EP,US);
A61M5/3287 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR KOMBINIERTE BEHANDLUNG | [2010/34] | English: | DEVICE FOR COMBINED TREATMENT | [2010/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR POLYTHÉRAPIE | [2010/34] |
Former [2009/27] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE KOMBINIERTE BEHANDLUNG | ||
Former [2009/27] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR COMBINED TREATMENT | ||
Former [2009/27] | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR POLYTHÉRAPIE | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 22.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.11.2010 | BE | 24.11.2010 | CY | 24.11.2010 | CZ | 24.11.2010 | DK | 24.11.2010 | EE | 24.11.2010 | FI | 24.11.2010 | HU | 24.11.2010 | IT | 24.11.2010 | LT | 24.11.2010 | LV | 24.11.2010 | MT | 24.11.2010 | NL | 24.11.2010 | PL | 24.11.2010 | RO | 24.11.2010 | SE | 24.11.2010 | SI | 24.11.2010 | SK | 24.11.2010 | TR | 24.11.2010 | BG | 24.02.2011 | GR | 25.02.2011 | ES | 07.03.2011 | IS | 24.03.2011 | PT | 24.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
MT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
TR | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
MT | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
PL | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
LT | 24.11.2010 | ||
LV | 24.11.2010 | ||
NL | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
IS | 24.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9639960 (UNIV TEMPLE [US]) [X] 1-3,13 * page 16, line 9 - page 27, line 4; figures 11,12C *; | [XA]WO0137919 (CRYOCATH TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al) [X] 1-5,9,13 * page 8, line 22 - page 12, line 27; figures 14-17,26,27 * [A] 6-8,10-12; | [X]WO0197702 (SANARUS MEDICAL INC [US]) [X] 1,13 * page 7, line 15 - page 10, line 27 *; | [A]US2003181897 (THOMAS SIMON W H [US], et al) [A] 6-8 * paragraphs [0073] - [0084]; figures 8a-11 *; | [PX]WO2006127467 (MYOSCIENCE INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-3,13 * paragraphs [0012] , [0014] , [0077] - [0080]; figure 5a *; | [PA]WO2007086056 (GALIL MEDICAL LTD [IL], et al) [PA] 1-13* the whole document * |