EP2061149 - TRIANGULAR WAVEFORM GENERATING CIRCUIT, GENERATING METHOD, INVERTER USING THEM, LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE AND LIQUID CRYSTAL TELEVISION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | [2009/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGINO, Junichi c/o Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | 02 /
FUKUMOTO, Kenichi c/o Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | [2009/21] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 07805804.7 | 03.09.2007 | [2009/21] | WO2007JP00949 | Priority number, date | JP20060241990 | 06.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006241990 | [2009/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008029509 | Date: | 13.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2061149 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H03K4/06, H02M7/48 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
H03K4/502 (EP,US);
H03K4/06 (KR);
H02M7/48 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER DREIECK-SIGNALFORM, ERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN, WECHSELRICHTER DAMIT, LICHT EMITTIERENDE EINRICHTUNG UND FLÜSSIGKRISTALL-FERNSEHER | [2009/21] | English: | TRIANGULAR WAVEFORM GENERATING CIRCUIT, GENERATING METHOD, INVERTER USING THEM, LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE AND LIQUID CRYSTAL TELEVISION | [2009/21] | French: | CIRCUIT DE GÉNÉRATION DE FORMES D'ONDE TRIANGULAIRES, PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION, INVERSEUR LES UTILISANT, DISPOSITIF ÉMETTANT DE LA LUMIÈRE ET TÉLÉVISION À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES | [2009/21] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | Translation filed | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2009/21] | 09.06.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 31.07.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2002199242 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]JPS62169514 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2003274668 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH); | [A]JPH06230267 (COPAL CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2004072657 | JP2001345682 | JP2004242403 |