EP2060352 - INSERT FOR ROUGHING AND ROUGHING END MILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | [2009/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORIIKE, Nobukazu c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION Tsukuba Plant 1511, Furumagi Joso-shi Ibaraki-ken 300-2795 / JP | 02 /
KITAJIMA, Jun c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION Tsukuba Plant 1511, Furumagi Joso-shi Ibaraki-ken 300-2795 / JP | [2012/50] |
Former [2010/52] | 01 /
HORIIKE, Nobukazu MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION Tsukuba Plant 1511, Furumagi Joso-shi Ibaraki-ken 300-2795 / JP | ||
02 /
KITAJIMA, Jun MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION Tsukuba Plant 1511, Furumagi Joso-shi Ibaraki-ken 300-2795 / JP | |||
Former [2009/21] | 01 /
HORIIKE, Nobukazu MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION, Tsukuba Plant 1511, Furumagi Joso-shi Ibaraki 300-2795 / JP | ||
02 /
KITAJIMA, Jun MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION, Tsukuba Plant 1511, Furumagi Joso-shi Ibaraki 300-2795 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/51] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/21] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07807233.7 | 13.09.2007 | [2009/21] | WO2007JP67826 | Priority number, date | JP20060248174 | 13.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006248174 | JP20060295906 | 31.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006295906 | [2009/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008032778 | Date: | 20.03.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2060352 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2060352 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.03.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/10, B23C5/20 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
B23C5/109 (EP,KR,US);
B23C5/202 (EP,US);
B23C5/205 (KR);
B23C2200/206 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2210/66 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2220/60 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T407/192 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1924 (EP,US);
Y10T407/23 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/21] | Title | German: | AUFRAUEINSATZ UND AUFRAUSCHAFTFRÄSER | [2009/21] | English: | INSERT FOR ROUGHING AND ROUGHING END MILL | [2009/21] | French: | PLAQUETTE POUR DÉGROSSISSAGE ET FRAISE EN BOUT DE DÉGROSSISSAGE | [2009/21] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2009 | Translation filed | 19.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/21] | 16.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.09.2007 | AT | 19.12.2012 | BE | 19.12.2012 | CY | 19.12.2012 | CZ | 19.12.2012 | DK | 19.12.2012 | EE | 19.12.2012 | FI | 19.12.2012 | IT | 19.12.2012 | LT | 19.12.2012 | LV | 19.12.2012 | MC | 19.12.2012 | MT | 19.12.2012 | NL | 19.12.2012 | PL | 19.12.2012 | RO | 19.12.2012 | SI | 19.12.2012 | SK | 19.12.2012 | TR | 19.12.2012 | BG | 19.03.2013 | GR | 20.03.2013 | ES | 30.03.2013 | IS | 19.04.2013 | PT | 19.04.2013 | IE | 13.09.2013 | LU | 13.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
MT | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
TR | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
IE | 13.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
IE | 13.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
DK | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 19.12.2012 | |
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 19.12.2012 | |
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 19.12.2012 | |
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 19.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB1207782 (MAYDOWN PRODUCTS LTD) [X] 1,2,5 * figures 1,3-6 * * column 2, line 40 - line 65 * [I] 3,4; | [X]FR2183362 (GIRAUD PIERRE [FR]) [X] 1,5 * figures 1-3 * * page 2, line 2 - line 3 *; | [X]JPS4985677 (MALINCHAK PAUL) [X] 1,2,5* figures 1-10 * | International search | [A]JPS4985677 ; | [X]JPS55179719U | by applicant | JPH081426 | JPH081427 | JP2006248174 | JP2006295906 |