EP2176989 - METHOD OF PREVENTING TCP-BASED DENIAL-OF-SERVICE ATTACKS ON MOBILE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, NL, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDS Co., Ltd. West Campus Samsung SDS Tower 125, Olympic-ro 35-gil Songpa-gu Seoul / KR | [2015/35] |
Former [2015/25] | For all designated states Samsung SDS Co. Ltd. Irok Bldg. 707-19 Yeoksam 2-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-918 / KR | ||
Former [2010/16] | For all designated states Samsung SDS Co. Ltd. Irok Bldg. 707-19 Yeoksam 2-dong Ganguam-gu Seoul 135-918 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOO, In Seon 1/731 Sejong Grancia 187-2 Gumi-Dong Bundang-Gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-810 / KR | [2015/25] |
Former [2010/16] | 01 /
YOO, In Seon 1/731 Sejong Grancia 187-2 Gumi-Dong Bundang-Gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-810 / KR | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/25] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/16] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07808231.0 | 14.09.2007 | [2010/16] | WO2007KR04440 | Priority number, date | KR20070079637 | 08.08.2007 Original published format: KR 20070079637 | [2010/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009020255 | Date: | 12.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2176989 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2176989 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.02.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/22 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
H04L63/1458 (EP,KR,US);
H04L69/16 (EP,KR,US);
H04W12/126 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/25] |
Former [2010/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERHINDERN VON AUF TCP BASIERENDEN DENIAL-OF-SERVICE-ATTACKEN AUF MOBILGERÄTE | [2010/16] | English: | METHOD OF PREVENTING TCP-BASED DENIAL-OF-SERVICE ATTACKS ON MOBILE DEVICES | [2010/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉVENTION D'ATTAQUES DE REFUS DE SERVICE BASÉES SUR TCP SUR DES DISPOSITIFS MOBILES | [2010/16] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2010 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 14.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.09.2007 | AT | 17.06.2015 | CY | 17.06.2015 | CZ | 17.06.2015 | DK | 17.06.2015 | EE | 17.06.2015 | ES | 17.06.2015 | FI | 17.06.2015 | IT | 17.06.2015 | LT | 17.06.2015 | LV | 17.06.2015 | MC | 17.06.2015 | MT | 17.06.2015 | NL | 17.06.2015 | PL | 17.06.2015 | RO | 17.06.2015 | SE | 17.06.2015 | SI | 17.06.2015 | SK | 17.06.2015 | TR | 17.06.2015 | IE | 14.09.2015 | LU | 14.09.2015 | BG | 17.09.2015 | GR | 18.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | FR | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | IS | 17.10.2015 | PT | 19.10.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/21] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 14.09.2015 | ||
LU | 14.09.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 14.09.2015 | ||
LU | 14.09.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
IE | 14.09.2015 | ||
LU | 14.09.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
LU | 14.09.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
IT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
LU | 14.09.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
ES | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 17.06.2015 | |
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006190720 (OZAKI HIROTSUGU [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0151] - paragraph [0176] *; | [A]WO2006082507 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0070] * | [IA] - DOUGLAS E COMER, "Internetworking With TCP/IP, Vol I: Principles, Protocols, and Architecture; Fourth edition; Chapter 13 - TCP", INTERNETWORKING WITH TCP/IP: PRINCIPLES, PROTOCOLS ANDARCHITECTURE, PRENTICE-HALL, ENGLEWOOD CLIFFS, NJ, US, (20000101), pages 209 - 251, XP002310034 [I] 1-3 * Section 13.23 Establishing a TCP Connection Section 13.26 Connection Reset * [A] 4-11 | [IA] - BRUSCHI D ET AL, "DISARMING OFFENSE TO FACILITATE DEFENSE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NEW SECURITY PARADIGMS WORKSHOP. (NSPW). BALLYCOTTON, COUNTY CORK, IRELAND, SEPT. 18 - 22, 2000; [NEW SECURITY PARADIGMS WORKSHOP], NEW YORK, NY : ACM, US, (20000918), doi:10.1145/366173.366192, ISBN 978-1-58113-260-1, pages 69 - 75, XP000988603 [I] 6-8 * Section 3.2 Uncompleted Connections * [A] 1-5,9-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/366173.366192 | [I] - SCHUBA C L ET AL, "Analysis of a denial of service attack on TCP", SECURITY AND PRIVACY, 1997. PROCEEDINGS., 1997 IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON OAKLAND, CA, USA 4-7 MAY 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19970504), doi:10.1109/SECPRI.1997.601338, ISBN 978-0-8186-7828-8, pages 208 - 223, XP010230160 [I] 4-11 * Section 2.2.3 TCP Connection Establishment * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SECPRI.1997.601338 | International search | [A]US2006230129 (SWAMI YOGESH P [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * See abstract; figures 1A, 2-5; claims 1-4. *; | [A]US2006229022 (BU TIAN [US], et al) [A] 1, 4, 5, 6, 9, 11 * See abstract; figures 2, 3,4; claims 1, 9, 10. *; | [A]US2006230450 (BU TIAN [US], et al) [A] 1, 4, 5, 6, 9, 11 * See abstract; claims 13-17, 20. *; | [A]US2003084321 (TARQUINI RICHARD PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1, 4, 5, 6, 9, 11 * See abstract; claims 1-3. * |