EP2040983 - COMPRESSIBLE TRANSPARENT SEALING FOR OPEN MICROPLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5791 Van Allen Way Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | ||
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5791 Van Alley Way Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | ||
Former [2009/14] | For all designated states Applera Corporation 850 Lincoln Centre Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRANO, Kirk M. 806 Peary Lane Foster City, California 94404 / US | 02 /
NURSE, James C. 4460 Entrada Drive Pleasanton, California 94566 / US | 03 /
CARRILLO, Albert L. 508 Lincoln Avenue Redwood City, California 94061 / US | 04 /
LU, Mike Y. 1057 Kelly Drive San Jose, California 95129 / US | 05 /
FAWCETT, Adrian 3606 W. Las Positas Blvd. Pleasanton, California 94588 / US | [2009/14] | Representative(s) | Wöhler, Christian, et al Life Technologies Frankfurter Straße 129 B 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Wöhler, Christian, et al Life Technologies Frankfurter Straße 129 B 64293 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [2010/37] | Schnappauf, Georg, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/14] | Cramphorn, Conrad Dr. Volker Vossius Patent-und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07809899.3 | 26.06.2007 | [2009/14] | WO2007US14810 | Priority number, date | US20060816689P | 26.06.2006 Original published format: US 816689 P | US20060816814P | 26.06.2006 Original published format: US 816814 P | US20060816816P | 26.06.2006 Original published format: US 816816 P | US20060816817P | 26.06.2006 Original published format: US 816817 P | US20070768369 | 26.06.2007 Original published format: US 768369 | [2009/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008002562 | Date: | 03.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2040983 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65B7/28 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
B01L3/50851 (EP,US);
B01L3/50853 (EP,US);
G01N35/028 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0605 (EP,US);
B01L2200/0642 (EP,US);
B01L2200/142 (EP,US);
B01L2300/041 (EP,US);
B01L2300/044 (EP,US);
B01L2300/046 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0654 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0829 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0864 (EP,US);
B01L2300/1822 (EP,US);
B01L2300/1827 (EP,US);
B01L2300/1872 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0406 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0487 (EP,US);
B01L3/563 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMPRIMIERBARE TRANSPARENTE DICHTUNG FÜR OFFENE MIKROPLATTEN | [2009/14] | English: | COMPRESSIBLE TRANSPARENT SEALING FOR OPEN MICROPLATES | [2009/14] | French: | SCELLEMENT TRANSPARENT COMPRESSIBLE POUR MICROPLAQUES OUVERTES | [2009/14] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 03.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/30] | 08.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE10002666 (GREINER BIO ONE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10-13,15 * column 6, line 6043 - column 7; figures 1,2,5B; claims 1,17-21 * [I] 4,9,14; | [XI]US5604130 (WARNER BRIAN D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,11,12 * figures 5A-5D * [I] 3,4,8,9,13; | [XI]US2004096622 (RAZAVI ALI [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,11-13 * figures 1,2; example 1; claims 1,5,14 * [I] 4,5,9,10,14,15; | [X]US2003150982 (RETHWISCH HANNA [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,11,12 * figure 2; claims 1,8 *; | [XI]US6908594 (SCHAEVITZ SAMUEL BENJAMIN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,11,12 * column 2, line 10 - column 2, line 64; figure 3; claims 3-6 * [I] 4,9,14; | [X]WO0158591 (CYBIO INSTR GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,11,12 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2,3,7,8,10 *; | [X]US2005232818 (SANDELL DONALD [US], et al) [X] 1,6,11,12 * paragraph [0493] - paragraph [0500]; figures 26-28 * | International search | [X]US6767401 (GOODWIN JR RICHARD H [US]) |