EP2038936 - MICRO CONCENTRATORS ELASTICALLY COUPLED WITH SPHERICAL PHOTOVOLTAIC CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Energy Related Devices, Inc. 127 Eastgate Industrial Park Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US | [2009/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOCKADAY, Robert G. 3025 Arizona Avenue Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US | [2009/13] | Representative(s) | Atkinson, Ralph, et al Atkinson & Company Intellectual Property Limited 7 Moorgate Road Rotherham South Yorkshire S60 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | Atkinson, Ralph, et al Atkinson & Company Intellectual Property Limited 7 Moorgate Road Rotherham South Yorkshire S60 2EN / GB | ||
Former [2009/13] | Chapman, Paul Nicholas, et al Atkinson Burrington Limited 28 President Buildings President Way Sheffield S4 7UR / GB | Application number, filing date | 07810263.9 | 09.07.2007 | [2009/13] | WO2007US15623 | Priority number, date | US20060819273P | 07.07.2006 Original published format: US 819273 P | [2009/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008005557 | Date: | 10.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2038936 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02N6/00 | [2009/28] | CPC: |
H01L31/05 (EP);
H01L31/02 (KR);
H01L31/035281 (EP);
H01L31/0543 (EP);
H01L31/0547 (EP);
H01L31/055 (EP);
Y02E10/52 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/13] | H01L31/0236 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIT KUGELFÖRMIGEN PV-ZELLEN ELASTISCH GEKOPPELTE MIKROKONZENTRATOREN | [2009/13] | English: | MICRO CONCENTRATORS ELASTICALLY COUPLED WITH SPHERICAL PHOTOVOLTAIC CELLS | [2009/13] | French: | MICRO - CONCENTRATEURS COUPLES ELASTIQUEMENT AVEC DES CELLULES PHOTOVOLTAIQUES SPHERIQUES | [2009/13] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/13] | 06.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/28] | 29.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4514580 (BARTLETT ROBERT W [US]); | [Y]US4697041 (OKANIWA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US6355873 (ISHIKAWA AKIRA [US]); | [X]US2002096206 (HAMAKAWA YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US6528717 (ASAI KOICHI [JP], et al) |