EP2018379 - SCOPINE SALTS AND THEIR USE IN PROCESSES FOR THE PREPARATION OF N-DEMETHYL-TIOTROPIUM AND TIOTROPIUM BROMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sicor, Inc. 19 Hughes Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [2012/16] |
Former [2009/05] | For all designated states Sicor, Inc. 19 Hughes Irvine, CA 92618 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSOLLI, Jonathan Via Buronzo N. 65 I-13040 Carisio (vc) / IT | 02 /
DIULGHEROFF, Nicola C. So Tassoni, 34 Torino / IT | 03 /
VOLONTÈ Roberta Via de Amicis N. 4 I-22069 Rovellasca (co) / IT | 04 /
PONTIROLI, Alessandro Via Begoglio 40 S. Maria Della Versa (pv) / IT | [2012/14] |
Former [2009/05] | 01 /
BUSOLLI, Jonathan Via Buronzo N. 65 I-13040 Carisio (vc) / IT | ||
02 /
DIULGHEROFF, Nicola C. So Tassoni, 34 Torino / IT | |||
03 /
VOLONTÈ Roberta Via de Amicis N. 4 I-22069 Rovellasca (co) / IT | |||
04 /
PONTIROLI, Alessandro Via Begoglio 40 S. Maria Della Versa (pv) / IT | |||
05 /
PONTIROLI, Alessandro Via Begoglio 40 S. Maria Della Versa (pv) / IT | Representative(s) | Gallagher, Kirk James, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Gallagher, Kirk James, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2009/05] | Russell, Tim, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07810332.2 | 10.07.2007 | [2009/05] | WO2007US15787 | Priority number, date | US20060830231P | 10.07.2006 Original published format: US 830231 P | US20060835200P | 03.08.2006 Original published format: US 835200 P | US20060835201P | 03.08.2006 Original published format: US 835201 P | US20060836037P | 07.08.2006 Original published format: US 836037 P | US20060643013 | 19.12.2006 Original published format: US 643013 | [2009/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008008376 | Date: | 17.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2018379 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2018379 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D451/06, C07D451/10 | [2009/05] | CPC: |
C07D451/06 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D451/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/05] | Title | German: | SCOPIN-SALZE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG IN VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON N-DEMETHYL-TIOTROPIUM UND TIOTROPIUMBROMID | [2011/42] | English: | SCOPINE SALTS AND THEIR USE IN PROCESSES FOR THE PREPARATION OF N-DEMETHYL-TIOTROPIUM AND TIOTROPIUM BROMIDE | [2009/05] | French: | SELS DE SCOPINE ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS DES PROCÉDÉS POUR LA PRÉPARATION DE N-DÉMÉTHYL-TIOTROPIUM ET DE BROMURE DE TIOTROPIUM | [2011/42] |
Former [2009/05] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TIOTROPIUMBROMID | ||
Former [2009/05] | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRÉPARATION DE BROMURE DE TIOTROPIUM | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2008 | Examination requested [2009/05] | 12.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.07.2007 | CY | 18.04.2012 | CZ | 18.04.2012 | DK | 18.04.2012 | EE | 18.04.2012 | FI | 18.04.2012 | LT | 18.04.2012 | LV | 18.04.2012 | MT | 18.04.2012 | RO | 18.04.2012 | SI | 18.04.2012 | SK | 18.04.2012 | IE | 10.07.2012 | LU | 10.07.2012 | BG | 18.07.2012 | CH | 31.07.2012 | LI | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | IS | 18.08.2012 | PT | 20.08.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
IE | 10.07.2012 | ||
LU | 10.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
MT | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
IE | 10.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
IE | 10.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
CZ | 18.04.2012 | ||
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
RO | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
SK | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
EE | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
DK | 18.04.2012 | ||
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
PT | 20.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
SI | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
LV | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 18.04.2012 | |
FI | 18.04.2012 | ||
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 18.04.2012 | |
LT | 18.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 18.04.2012 | Cited in | International search | [DX]GB1469781 (BOEHRINGER SOHN INGELHEIM) [DX] 1,3,4 * example 1 *; | [DAX]US5610163 (BANHOLZER ROLF [DE], et al) [DA] 1-26,29-33 * column 7, lines 1-53; examples 1-4 * [X] 27-32; | [A]WO0232898 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE], et al) [A] 27-32* page 7, line 12 - page 8, line 5; claim 12 *; | [X]US2004242622 (MAMMEN MATHAI [US], et al) [X] 27-32 * page 29, paragraphs 504,505 *; | [X] - JINGXI XIE ET AL, "Improvement of studies on total synthesis of anisodine", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, XP002482293 [X] 1-4 * compounds RN 83350-03-2 * | [X] - YAPING ZHUANG AND LIQIN ZHAO, "Systemic analysis of 150 kinds of tablet", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, XP002482294 [X] 1-4 * compounds RN 83350-03-2 * | [X] - HANS E SCHINK, HELENA PETTERSSON AND JAN-E BÄCKVALL, "Stereocontrolled epoxidations of cycloheptene derivatives in the palladium-catalysed route to tropane alkaloids", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 56, no. 8, pages 2769 - 2774, XP002482292 [X] 1,3,4 * Scheme II p.2770; 2nd full par. p.2771; Scopine Hydrochloride (1.HCl) p.2773 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00008a037 |