EP2043619 - CHEWABLE TABLET CONTAINING PHENYLEPHRINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 13.04.2016 [2016/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyeth LLC 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017-5755 / US | [2014/10] |
Former [2010/16] | For all designated states Wyeth LLC Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | ||
Former [2009/15] | For all designated states Wyeth 5 Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUBARA, Josephine 12700 Beryl Court Richmond, Virginia 23233 / US | 02 /
MABRY, Mark 9407 Orchid Terrace Chesterfield, Virginia 23832 / US | 03 /
DURR, Aaron, Lewis 4813 Fort McHenry Parkway Glen Allen, Virginia 23060 / US | 04 /
TAYLOR, Angela 3513 Chagford Drive Chester, Virginia 23831 / US | 05 /
ALLEY, Amanda 1906 Valerie Drive Midlothian, Virginia 23114 / US | 06 /
GIAMALVA, David, H. 10638 Meadowbrook Road Glen Allen, Virginia 23060 / US | 07 /
AGRAWAL, Manish PMB 228, 220 Route 12 Suite 5 Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [2012/33] |
Former [2012/09] | Hayles, James Richard, et al Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25, avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | ||
Former [2010/32] | Rutt, Jason Edward, et al Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/15] | Talbott, Dawn Jacqueline Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Huntercombe Lane South, Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07810561.6 | 18.07.2007 | [2009/15] | WO2007US16258 | Priority number, date | US20060492656 | 25.07.2006 Original published format: US 492656 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008013710 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2043619 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/68, A61K31/137 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
A61K31/137 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0058 (KR);
A61K31/4402 (EP,US);
A61K9/0056 (EP,US);
A61K9/20 (KR);
A61P25/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Extension states | AL | 21.01.2009 | BA | 21.01.2009 | HR | 21.01.2009 | MK | 21.01.2009 | RS | 21.01.2009 | Title | German: | PHENYLEPHRINHALTIGE KAUTABLETTE | [2009/15] | English: | CHEWABLE TABLET CONTAINING PHENYLEPHRINE | [2009/15] | French: | COMPRIMÉ CROQUABLE CONTENANT DE LA PHÉNYLÉPHRINE | [2009/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 10.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.04.2015 | 07.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/15] | 17.04.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/15] | 28.04.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.04.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 01.04.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3629394 (GAUNT WILLIAM E, et al) [X] 1-38 * column 2, lines 9-19; example 2; claims 1-5 *; | [X]WO0241920 (ELAN CORP PLC [IE], et al) [X] 1-38 * examples 5,10; claims 1,3 *; | [X]WO03009834 (BATTEY ALYCE S [US], et al) [X] 1-38 * page 5, lines 16-21; example 14 * * page 10, lines 17-22; claims 1,3,7-13 *; | [A]WO03011306 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-38* the whole document *; | [X]JP2004269517 (ROHTO PHARMA) [X] 1-38 * example 5; claim 1 *; | [X]WO2006064327 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al) [X] 1-38 * page 14, lines 5,6; examples 1-6; claims 1,13 * * page 18, lines 19,20 * | Examination | - Chafetz ET AL, "Phenolic cyclization of epinephrine, metaproterenol, metaraminol, phenylephrine, and terbutaline with formaldehyde.", Pharmaceutical Research, (19870401), vol. 4, no. 2, ISSN 0724-8741, pages 158 - 61, XP055144270 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1016431422441 | by applicant | US3629394 | WO0241920 | WO03009834 | WO03011306 | JP2004269517 | WO2006064327 |