EP2049635 - LUBRICANT COMPOSITIONS, THEIR PREPARATION AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900 Clinton Township Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900 Clinton Township Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US | ||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states EXXONMOBIL RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY 1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900 Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DECKMAN, Douglas, Edward 5 Peachtree Lane Mullica Hill, NJ 08062 / US | 02 /
BAILLARGEON, David, J. 112 Morningside Drive Cherry Hill, NJ 08003 / US | 03 /
HORODYSKY, Andrew, G. 139 Weston Drive Cherry Hill, NJ 08003 / US | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe LLC IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | Troch, Geneviève, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. I.P. Law Shared Services P.O. Box 105 Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 07810669.7 | 20.07.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007US16494 | Priority number, date | US20060833871P | 28.07.2006 Original published format: US 833871 P | [2009/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008013754 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2049635 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C10M169/04, C10N20/02, C10N40/08, C10N40/25 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
C10M169/04 (EP,US);
C10M2205/173 (EP,US);
C10M2207/262 (EP,US);
C10M2215/28 (EP,US);
C10M2223/045 (EP,US);
C10M2229/02 (EP,US);
C10N2030/02 (EP,US);
C10N2030/40 (EP,US);
C10N2030/42 (EP,US);
C10N2030/45 (EP,US);
C10N2030/52 (EP,US);
C10N2040/08 (EP,US);
C10N2040/25 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C10M2207/262, C10N2010/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/36] |
Former [2009/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHMIERMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2009/17] | English: | LUBRICANT COMPOSITIONS, THEIR PREPARATION AND USE | [2009/17] | French: | FORMULES LUBRIFIANTES, LEUR ÉLABORATION ET LEUR APPLICATION | [2009/17] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 03.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/19] | 05.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006131210 (ROSENBAUM JOHN M [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0002] , [0015] , [0017] , [0089] - [0092] - [0095] , [0102] - [0105]; claims 1-23; tables I,II,VIII,IX,X *; | [DA]WO9830306 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [DA] 1-18 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph LAST - page 7, paragraph 1 * * claims 1-5 * |