EP2047670 - PRODUCING AN EXTENDED DYNAMIC RANGE DIGITAL IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intellectual Ventures Fund 83 LLC 7251 W Lake Mead Boulevard Suite 300 Las Vegas, NV 89128 / US | [2013/18] |
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORDER, John Norvold 860 Kutruff Road Walworth, New York 14568 / US | 02 /
MORALES, Efrain Orlando 76 Bradford Road Rochester, New York 14618 / US | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2013/13] | Small, Gary James, et al Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2009/16] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak SA Etablissement de Chalon Campus Industriel - Département Brevets Route de Demigny - Z.I. Nord - B.P. 21 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07810689.5 | 23.07.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007US16556 | Priority number, date | US20060460364 | 27.07.2006 Original published format: US 460364 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008013770 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2047670 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/20, G06T5/20 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
H04N5/20 (EP,US);
G06T5/50 (EP,US);
H04N23/741 (EP,US);
H04N25/46 (EP);
H04N25/57 (EP);
H04N3/1562 (US);
H04N25/447 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2009/35] |
Former [2009/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG EINES DIGITALBILDES MIT ERWEITERTEM DYNAMISCHEM BEREICH | [2009/16] | English: | PRODUCING AN EXTENDED DYNAMIC RANGE DIGITAL IMAGE | [2009/16] | French: | PRODUCTION D'UNE IMAGE NUMÉRIQUE À PLAGE DYNAMIQUE ÉTENDUE | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 28.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/30] | 27.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5235434 (WOBER MUNIB [US]); | [A]US5870505 (WOBER MUNIB A [US], et al); | [A]US2003117412 (BROOKSBY GLEN WILLIAM [US], et al); | [Y]US2005103977 (KRYMSKI ALEXANDER [US]) |