EP2074368 - METHOD OF IMPROVING NOX EMISSIONS CONTROL IN ROTARY PREHEATER LIMESTONE KILNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/27] | METHOD OF IMPROVING NOX EMISSIONS CONTROL IN ROTARY PREHEATER MINERAL KILNS | ||
[2019/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHEMICAL LIME COMPANY 3700 Hulen Street Fort Worth, TX 76107 / US | [2009/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOLAN, Paul, S. 6800 Desert Highlands Drive Forth Worth, TX 76132 / US | 02 /
KOHL, Robert, F. 26010 N. Wrangler Road Scottsdale, AZ 85255 / US | 03 /
LAUER, Juergen 113 Sugarberry Drive Maylene, AL 35114 / US | 04 /
SEITZ, Kerry 1400 Park Place Soutlake, TX 76092 / US | [2009/27] | Representative(s) | Claeys, Pierre, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [2019/36] |
Former [2009/30] | Claeys, Pierre, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Intellectual Property House, Brussels Airport Business Park Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [2009/27] | Claeys, Pierre, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 07810857.8 | 27.07.2007 | [2009/27] | WO2007US16921 | Priority number, date | US20060498558 | 03.08.2006 Original published format: US 498558 | [2009/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008019003 | Date: | 14.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2074368 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2074368 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F27B7/20, F27B7/32, F27B7/36, F27D17/00, C04B2/10, B01D53/56 | [2019/14] | CPC: |
F27B7/2016 (EP,US);
B01D53/56 (EP,US);
C04B2/104 (EP,US);
F27B7/3205 (EP,US);
F27B7/362 (EP,US);
F27D17/008 (EP,US);
B01D2251/2062 (EP,US);
B01D2251/2067 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00017 (EP,US);
Y02P40/40 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/41] | F27B1/00, F27B15/00, B01D53/56, C04B7/36 | ||
Former IPC [2009/27] | F27B1/00, F27B15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/36] |
Former [2009/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR VERBESSERTE NOX-EMISSIONSKONTROLLE IN ROTATIONSVORWÄRMÖFEN ZUR KALKVERARBEITUNG | [2019/14] | English: | METHOD OF IMPROVING NOX EMISSIONS CONTROL IN ROTARY PREHEATER LIMESTONE KILNS | [2019/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION DU CONTRÔLE DES ÉMISSIONS DE NOX DANS DES FOURS ROTATIFS DE CALCAIRE À PRÉCHAUFFEUR | [2019/14] |
Former [2009/27] | VERFAHREN FÜR VERBESSERTE NOX-EMISSIONSKONTROLLE IN ROTATIONSVORWÄRMÖFEN ZUR MINERALVERARBEITUNG | ||
Former [2009/27] | METHOD OF IMPROVING NOX EMISSIONS CONTROL IN ROTARY PREHEATER MINERAL KILNS | ||
Former [2009/27] | PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION DU CONTRÔLE DES ÉMISSIONS DE NOX DANS DES FOURS ROTATIFS DE MINERAI À PRÉCHAUFFEUR | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 23.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 23.05.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 23.05.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.11.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 23.05.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 23.05.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.11.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 17.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.07.2007 | AT | 04.09.2019 | CY | 04.09.2019 | CZ | 04.09.2019 | DK | 04.09.2019 | EE | 04.09.2019 | ES | 04.09.2019 | FI | 04.09.2019 | IT | 04.09.2019 | LT | 04.09.2019 | LV | 04.09.2019 | MC | 04.09.2019 | MT | 04.09.2019 | NL | 04.09.2019 | PL | 04.09.2019 | RO | 04.09.2019 | SE | 04.09.2019 | SI | 04.09.2019 | SK | 04.09.2019 | TR | 04.09.2019 | BG | 04.12.2019 | GR | 05.12.2019 | IS | 05.01.2020 | PT | 06.01.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
TR | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 04.09.2019 | |
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 04.09.2019 | |
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 04.09.2019 | |
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | EE | 04.09.2019 | |
ES | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | ES | 04.09.2019 | |
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
NL | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 04.09.2019 | |
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
SE | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 04.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9737754 (NALCO FUEL TECH [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9 * claims 1-6 * * figure 1 *[I] 6; | [XP]WO2007082198 (CADENCE ENVIRONMENTAL ENERGY [US], et al) [XP] 1-9 * figures 1-17 * * claims 1-14 * | International search | [A]US5919301 (ROTHER WOLFGANG [DE], et al); | [A]US6672865 (HANSEN ERIC R [US], et al); | [A]US6733283 (SKAARUP JENSEN LARS [DK], et al) | by applicant | US6672865 |