EP2069391 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING OPHTHALMIC DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Florida Research Foundation, Inc. P.O. Box 115500 Gainesville Florida 32611-5500 / US | [2009/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAUSHAL, Shalesh 6205 NW 81st Drive Gainesville, FL 32653 / US | 02 /
NOORWEZ, Syed, Mohammed 2930 SW 23rd Terrace, No. 2002 Gainesville, FL 32608 / US | [2010/48] |
Former [2009/25] | 01 /
KAUSHAL, Shalesh 6205 NW 81st Drive Gainesville, FL 32653 / US | ||
02 /
NOORWEZ, Syed, Mohammed 3461 S.W. 3rd Ave. No. 252 Gainesville, FL 32607 / US | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Edwards Wildman Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | ||
Former [2009/25] | Soames, Candida Jane Edwards Angell Palmer & Dodge Innovations LLP 10 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07810893.3 | 27.07.2007 | [2009/25] | WO2007US16990 | Priority number, date | US20060833884P | 27.07.2006 Original published format: US 833884 P | US20070878492P | 03.01.2007 Original published format: US 878492 P | US20070933431P | 05.06.2007 Original published format: US 933431 P | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008013984 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2069391 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/00, G01N33/53, A61K31/415 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
A61K31/203 (EP,US);
A61K38/02 (EP,US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
G01N2500/04 (EP,US);
G01N2800/16 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/203, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/02, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2009/25] | C07K14/00, G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG ODER PRÄVENTION VON AUGENLEIDEN | [2009/25] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING OR PREVENTING OPHTHALMIC DISEASE | [2009/25] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET METHODES DESTINEES A TRAITER ET/OU A PREVENIR DES MALADIES OPHTALMOLOGIQUES | [2009/25] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 23.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/13] | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4321395 (EICKEN KARL, et al) [X] 4-6,9 * column 8 *; | [A]WO2004082622 (PALCZEWSKI KRZYSZTOF [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005087210 (LARSEN LARS MICHAEL [DK]) [A] 1-19; | [A]WO2006002097 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006007314 (SYTERA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-19; | [A]WO2006033734 (SYTERA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-19; | [A]WO2006039551 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [A] 1-19; | [I] - KELLER C ET AL, "Protective effect of halothane anesthesia on retinal light damage: Inhibition of metabolic rhodopsin regeneration", INVESTIGATIVE OPHTHALMOLOGY & VISUAL SCIENCE, ASSOCIATION FOR RESEARCH IN VISION AND OPHTHALMOLOGY, US, (20010201), vol. 42, no. 2, ISSN 0146-0404, pages 476 - 480, XP008114892 [I] 1-19 * the whole document * | [I] - ISHIZAWA YUMIKO ET AL, "G protein-coupled receptors as direct targets of inhaled anesthetics.", MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY MAY 2002, (200205), vol. 61, no. 5, ISSN 0026-895X, pages 945 - 952, XP002556124 [I] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/mol.61.5.945 | [A] - WOLF GEORGE, "Lipofuscin and macular degeneration.", NUTRITION REVIEWS OCT 2003, (200310), vol. 61, no. 10, ISSN 0029-6643, pages 342 - 346, XP002556125 [A] 1-19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1301/nr.2003.oct.342-346 | [A] - RADU R A ET AL, "Isotretinoin treatment inhibits lipofuscin accumulation in a mouse model of recessive Stargardt's macular degeneration", NOVARTIS FOUNDATION SYMPOSIUM, WILEY, CHICHESTER, GB, (20040101), vol. 255, ISSN 1528-2511, pages 51 - 67, XP008114846 [A] 1-19 | [A] - GOLLAPALLI D R ET AL, "The specific binding of retinoic acid to RPE65 and approaches to the treatment of macular degeneration", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20040706), vol. 101, no. 27, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 10030 - 10035, XP003023101 [A] 1-19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0401936101 | [A] - MAITI PRANAB ET AL, "Small molecule RPE65 antagonists limit the visual cycle and prevent lipofuscin formation.", BIOCHEMISTRY 24 JAN 2006, (20060124), vol. 45, no. 3, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 852 - 860, XP002556126 [A] 1-19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BI0518545 | [A] - WOODRUFF MICHAEL L ET AL, "Spontaneous activity of opsin apoprotein is a cause of Leber congenital amaurosis.", NATURE GENETICS, (200310), vol. 35, no. 2, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 158 - 164, XP002556127 [A] 1-19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng1246 | [T] - TRAVIS GABRIEL H ET AL, "Diseases caused by defects in the visual cycle: retinoids as potential therapeutic agents.", ANNUAL REVIEW OF PHARMACOLOGY AND TOXICOLOGY 2007, (2007), vol. 47, ISSN 0362-1642, pages 469 - 512, XP002555339 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.pharmtox.47.120505.105225 | International search | [Y] - KEFALOV V.J. ET AL., "Occupancy of the chromophore binding site of opsin activates visual transduction in rod photoreceptors", J. GEN. PHYSIOL., (199903), vol. 113, no. 3, pages 491 - 503, XP002230640 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1085/jgp.113.3.491 | [Y] - NOORWEZ ET AL., "Pharmacological chaperone-mediated in vivo folding and stabilization of the P23H-opsin mutant associated with autosomal dominant retinitis pigmentosa", JBC, (2003), vol. 278, no. 16, pages 14442 - 14450, XP008103178 | [A] - MORELLO J.-P. ET AL., "Pharmacological chaperones: a new twist on receptor folding", TIPS, (200012), vol. 21, no. 12, pages 466 - 469, XP004226377 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-6147(00)01575-3 | [A] - NOORWEZ ET AL., "Retinoids assist the cellular folding of the autosomal dominant retinitis pigmentosa opsin mutant P23H", JBC, (200404), vol. 279, no. 16, pages 16278 - 16284, XP008103188 | [A] - PEREZ ET AL., "Multiple signaling states of G-protein-coupled receptors", PHARMACOL. REV., (2005), vol. 57, pages 147 - 161, XP008103219 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/pr.57.2.2 | [A] - NOORWEZ ET AL., "A high-throughput screening method for small-molecule pharmacologic chaperones of misfolded rhodopsin", INVEST. OPTHAL. VIS. SC., (200807), vol. 49, no. 7, pages 3224 - 3230, XP008103220 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1167/iovs.07-1539 | [Y] - ROZANOWSKA ET AL., "Light-induced damage to the retina: role of rhodopsin chromophore revisited", PHOTOCHEM. PHOTOBIOL., (2005), vol. 81, pages 1305 - 1330, XP008103221 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1562/2004-11-13-IR-371 | [A] - SPARROW ET AL., "A2E, a byproduct of the visual cycle", VIS. RES., (2003), vol. 43, pages 2983 - 2990, XP008103195 |