EP2046800 - 6-CARBOXY-NORMORPHINAN DERIVATIVES, SYNTHESIS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyeth LLC Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | [2010/16] |
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states Wyeth 5 Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAH, Syed, M. 1 Ora Court East Hanover, NJ 07936 / US | 02 /
ALI, Kadum, A. 32 Massachusetts Avenue Congers, NY 10920 / US | 03 /
KONG, FangMing 620 Birch Avenue River Vale, NJ 07675 / US | 04 /
ZHU, Tianmin 5 Wiltman Place Monroe, NY 10950 / US | 05 /
GOMBAR, Charles, T. 1652 Bow Tree Drive West Chester, PA 19380 / US | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Rudge, Andrew John, et al ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | Rudge, Andrew John, et al Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/16] | Talbott, Dawn Jacqueline Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Huntercombe Lane South, Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07811067.3 | 03.08.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007US17365 | Priority number, date | US20060835687P | 04.08.2006 Original published format: US 835687 P | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008016704 | Date: | 07.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2046800 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2046800 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D491/04, A61K31/4355, A61P25/36 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
C07D491/04 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 6-CARBOXY-NORMORPHINAN-DERIVATE, IHRE SYNTHESE UND VERWENDUNG | [2009/16] | English: | 6-CARBOXY-NORMORPHINAN DERIVATIVES, SYNTHESIS AND USES THEREOF | [2009/16] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE 6-CARBOXY-NORMORPHINANE, SYNTHÈSE ET APPLICATIONS | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 06.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.10.2010 | BE | 27.10.2010 | CY | 27.10.2010 | CZ | 27.10.2010 | DK | 27.10.2010 | EE | 27.10.2010 | FI | 27.10.2010 | HU | 27.10.2010 | IT | 27.10.2010 | LT | 27.10.2010 | LV | 27.10.2010 | MT | 27.10.2010 | NL | 27.10.2010 | PL | 27.10.2010 | RO | 27.10.2010 | SE | 27.10.2010 | SI | 27.10.2010 | SK | 27.10.2010 | TR | 27.10.2010 | BG | 27.01.2011 | GR | 28.01.2011 | ES | 07.02.2011 | IS | 27.02.2011 | PT | 28.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CY | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
MT | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
TR | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CY | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
MT | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
MT | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 27.10.2010 | |
BE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
NL | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4176186 (GOLDBERG LEON I [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * claims 1,4 *; | [A]EP0663401 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-35 * Compounds 241-242 on pages 249-250;; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2004043964 (MALLINCKRODT INC [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * claim 1 *; | [A] - YUAN CHUN-SU, "Clinical status of methylnaltrexone, a new agent to prevent and manage opioid-induced side effects.", JOURNAL OF SUPPORTIVE ONCOLOGY, BIOLINK COMMUNICATIONS,, US, (200403), vol. 2, no. 2, ISSN 1544-6794, pages 111 - 117, XP002390438 [A] 1-35 * page 112; figure 1 * | [A] - FLEISCHHACKER W ET AL, "14-Methyl-Derivate des Morphins mit 5-,6- oder 7gliedrigem Ring C", MONATSHEFTE FUR CHEMIE, SPRINGER VERLAG. WIEN, AT, (1977), vol. 108, ISSN 0026-9247, pages 1441 - 1454, XP009091952 [A] 1-35 * page 142; example 2k * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01046459 | [A] - GOERLITZER ET AL, "Darstellung und Charakterisierung von Bromierungsprodukten des Oxycodons", PHARMAZIE, DIE, GOVI VERLAG, ESCHBORN, DE, (1992), vol. 47, no. 12, ISSN 0031-7144, pages 893 - 897, XP001536594 [A] 1-35 * page 894, column 1 * | [A] - BOES ET AL, "A short and efficient synthesis of C-nor-dihydrocodeinone - the antipode of Goto's sinomenilone", HETEROCYCLES, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (1983), vol. 20, no. 6, ISSN 0385-5414, pages 1077 - 1081, XP009091976 [A] 1-35 * page 1077; examples 1,2 * | [A] - KRATZEL ET AL, "Synthesis of 5a,11b-propanonaphtho[1,2-e][1,2]oxazepines as potential opioid analgesics", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, PERKIN TRANSACTIONS 1, (1994), no. 11, pages 1541 - 1543, XP009092067 [A] 1-35 * examples 2a,2b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/p19940001541 | [A] - KRATZEL ET AL, "An efficient synthesis of 14-halogenomethyl-substituted C-normorphinans", HETEROCYCLES, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (1987), vol. 26, no. 10, ISSN 0385-5414, pages 2703 - 2710, XP009092043 [A] 1-35 * page 2703; examples 4,7 * |