EP2052173 - LOW FORCE ANTI STICKING THROTTLE VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BorgWarner Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | [2009/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TELEP, Robert, J. 37562 Southampton Livonia, MI 48154 / US | 02 /
BOGEN, Martin, P. 21805 Lakeshire Street St. Clair Shores, MI 48081 / US | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | Schmitz, Hans-Werner Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07811356.0 | 14.08.2007 | [2009/18] | WO2007US18134 | Priority number, date | US20060837532P | 14.08.2006 Original published format: US 837532 P | [2009/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008021430 | Date: | 21.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2052173 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/18, F16K15/00, F16K1/22 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
F16K1/22 (EP,KR,US);
F16K1/18 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2009/18] | F16K1/18, F16K15/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/37] |
Former [2009/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ANTIHAFT-DROSSELVENTIL MIT NIEDRIGER KRAFT | [2009/18] | English: | LOW FORCE ANTI STICKING THROTTLE VALVE | [2009/18] | French: | PAPILLON DES GAZ ANTI-GOMMAGE SOUS FAIBLE FORCE | [2009/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 16.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/21] | 11.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS61137858U (-) [X] 1,6-13,18-22 * figure - * [I] 2,3,14,15; | [XI]JPH01249931 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [X] 1,4,6-13,16,18-22 * abstract * [I] 2,3,5,14,15,17; | [X]US4860706 (SUZUKI TAKIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,6-13,18-22 * column 7, line 6 - line 60; figure 3b; claim 2 *; | [X]JPS6217324 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,7,8,10-12,18 * abstract *; | [X]US2006048505 (TAKAHASHI HIDEKI [JP]) [X] 1,4,6-9,11,13,16,18-22 * abstract *; | [A]FR2666395 (BAILLY COMTE ETS [FR]) [A] 1,5,11,17 * figure - * | International search | [A]JPS56105161 (KUBOTA LTD); | [A]JPH0617946 (KUBOTA KK); | [A]JPH0914464 (TOMOE GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO) |