EP2039150 - ENHANCED PROGRAM GUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scientific-Atlanta, Inc. 5030 Sugarloaf Parkway Lawrenceville, Georgia 30044 / US | [2009/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSTROWSKA, Barbara E. 815 Oxford Hall Drive Lawrenceville, Georgia 30044 / US | 02 /
CHIU, Man S. 5165 Cottage Farm Road Alpharetta, Georgia 30022 / US | [2009/13] | Representative(s) | Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/33] | Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/13] | Pautex Schneider, Nicole Véronique, et al Novagraaf International SA 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 07812181.1 | 18.06.2007 | [2009/13] | WO2007US71425 | Priority number, date | US20060427488 | 29.06.2006 Original published format: US 427488 | [2009/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008002784 | Date: | 03.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2039150 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445 | [2009/13] | CPC: |
H04N21/84 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/4314 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/4821 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/31] |
Former [2009/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERWEITERTER PROGRAMMFÜHRER | [2009/13] | English: | ENHANCED PROGRAM GUIDE | [2009/13] | French: | GUIDE DE PROGRAMMATION AMÉLIORÉ | [2009/13] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/13] | 30.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/11] | 29.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6247176 (SCHEIN STEVEN M [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-12,15-20 * column 5, line 38 - column 7, line 31; figures 2-4 * [Y] 6,7,13,14; | [Y]US5596373 (WHITE GAIL K [US], et al) [Y] 6,13 * figures 15A,15B *; | [Y]JPH11284920 (SONY CORP) [Y] 7,14 * figures 8,9,11 * |