EP2029997 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OSCILLATING A TEST SAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rudolph Research Analytical, Inc. 55 Newburgh Road Hackettstown, NJ 07840 / US | [2009/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAGNER, Jeff 9 Spruce Lane Long Valley, NJ 07853 / US | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | Prock, Thomas, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | Prock, Thomas, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2009/10] | Waldren, Robin Michael Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07812198.5 | 19.06.2007 | [2009/10] | WO2007US71526 | Priority number, date | US20060471355 | 20.06.2006 Original published format: US 471355 | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007149834 | Date: | 27.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2029997 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N9/00 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
G01N9/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SCHWENKUNG EINER TESTPROBE | [2009/10] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OSCILLATING A TEST SAMPLE | [2009/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT L'OSCILLATION D'UN ÉCHANTILLON D'ESSAI | [2009/10] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 06.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/50] | 16.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0538235 (LEOPOLD HANS O [AT], et al) [I] 1-19 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5477726 (STABINGER HANS [AT], et al); | [A]US5237853 (CASSADAY ERNEST W [US], et al); | [A]US4838084 (LEOPOLD HANS [AT], et al) |