EP2037736 - METHODS FOR TREATING CYSTIC KIDNEY DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Indiana University Research and Technology Corporation 351 West 10th Street Indianapolis, IN 46202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | For all designated states Indiana University Research and Technology Corporation 351 West 10th Street Indianapolis, IN 46202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOE, Shanon 1120 S. Dr. indianapolis, IN 46202 / US | 02 /
GATTONE, Vincent 7838 Estate Drive Brownsburg, IN 46112 / US | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | Teasdale, Nicola Joanne, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | [2012/24] |
Former [2011/38] | Martin, David John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2011/31] | Martin, David John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [2010/28] | Martin, David John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 5th Floor 14 South Parade Leeds LS1 5QS / GB | ||
Former [2009/13] | Armstrong, Iain Cheshire, et al Marks & Clerk Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 07812500.2 | 29.06.2007 | [2009/13] | WO2007US72533 | Priority number, date | US20060819765P | 10.07.2006 Original published format: US 819765 P | US20070941611P | 01.06.2007 Original published format: US 941611 P | [2009/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008008650 | Date: | 17.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2037736 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.01.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/00, A61F2/00 | [2009/13] | CPC: |
A61K31/135 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/185 (EP,US);
A61K31/196 (EP,US);
A61K31/4164 (EP,US);
A61K31/4168 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/00, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/13] | Extension states | AL | 30.01.2009 | BA | 30.01.2009 | HR | 30.01.2009 | MK | 30.01.2009 | RS | 30.01.2009 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ZYSTENNIERENERKRANKUNGEN | [2009/13] | English: | METHODS FOR TREATING CYSTIC KIDNEY DISEASES | [2009/13] | French: | MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES KYSTIQUES RÉNALES | [2009/13] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/13] | 20.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/50] | 31.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 19.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 19.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.10.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5972882 (GATTONE II VINCENT H [US]) [X] 1-7,23 * column 3, line 13 - line 26 * * column 16, line 15 - column 20, line 10; claim 1 *; | [X]US6638726 (WILSON PATRICIA D [US], et al) [X] 1-7,23 * column 15, line 5 - column 16, line 47; example 7; claims 18,19 *; | [E]WO2007112280 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [E] 1-7,11,13,23 * claims 1,17,32 *; | [E]WO2007124465 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [E] 1-7,11-23 * claims 14-43,60-64,66,80 * | [X] - GRANTHAM J J, "Time to treat polycystic kidney diseases like the neoplastic disorders that they are", KIDNEY INTERNATIONAL, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1046/J.1523-1755.2000.00849.X, (20000101), vol. 57, no. 1, ISSN 0085-2538, pages 339 - 340, XP002383965 [X] 1-7,23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1523-1755.2000.00849.x | [A] - GUAY-WOODFORD L M, "Murine models of polycystic kidney disease: Molecular and therapeutic insights", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY: RENAL, FLUID AND ELECTROLYTEPHYSIOLOGY, AMERICAN PHYSIOLOGICAL SOCIETY, US, (20030101), vol. 285, no. 6 54-6, ISSN 0363-6127, pages F1034 - F1049, XP002383967 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2005059023 (CANTOR THOMAS L [US]); | [Y] - MEDLINE PLUS, MEDICAL ENCYCLOPEDIA, "Medullary cystic kidney disease", URL: http://www.nlm.nih.gov/medlineplus/ency/article/000465.htm, XP008101442 | [Y] - MEDLINE PLUS, "Cinacalcet", pages 1 - 3, URL: http://www.nlm.nih.gov/medline/plusdruginfo/medmaster/a605004.html, XP008101443 | [Y] - "Cinacalcet", MICROMEDEX, pages 1 - 11, URL: http://www.micromedex.com/products/updates/drugdex_updates/de/cinacalcet.html, (20090202), XP008101350 | [Y] - AMGEN INC., "Sensipar (cinacalcet HCI) tablets", (20040308), XP008101453 |