EP2095431 - Photovoltaic module for roofs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/36] | PHOTOVOLTAIC MODULE FOR ROOFS | ||
[2010/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lumeta, Inc. 17182 Armstrong Avenue Irvine, CA 92614 / US | [2009/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLAHERTY, Brian, J. 320 Marks Road Alamo, CA 94507 / US | 02 /
DAVEY, Timothy, M. 2907 Cliff Drive Newport Beach, CA 92663 / US | [2009/36] | Representative(s) | Johnson, Richard Alan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Johnson, Richard Alan, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 07812531.7 | 30.06.2007 | [2009/36] | WO2007US72616 | Priority number, date | US20060615934 | 22.12.2006 Original published format: US 615934 | US20070771338 | 29.06.2007 Original published format: US 771338 | [2009/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008079436 | Date: | 03.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2095431 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2095431 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/042, H01L31/048 | [2010/29] | CPC: |
H02S20/24 (EP,US);
H01L31/048 (EP,US);
F24S2025/601 (EP,US);
Y02B10/10 (EP,US);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/36] | H01L31/042 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/36] | Title | German: | Fotovoltaisches Modul für Dächer | [2010/43] | English: | Photovoltaic module for roofs | [2010/43] | French: | Module photovoltaïque pour toits | [2010/43] |
Former [2009/36] | FOTOVOLTAISCHES MODUL FÜR DÄCHER | ||
Former [2009/36] | PHOTOVOLTAIC MODULE FOR ROOFS | ||
Former [2009/36] | MODULE PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE POUR TOITS | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 26.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.03.2011 | BE | 23.03.2011 | CY | 23.03.2011 | CZ | 23.03.2011 | DK | 23.03.2011 | EE | 23.03.2011 | FI | 23.03.2011 | HU | 23.03.2011 | LT | 23.03.2011 | LV | 23.03.2011 | MT | 23.03.2011 | NL | 23.03.2011 | PL | 23.03.2011 | RO | 23.03.2011 | SE | 23.03.2011 | SI | 23.03.2011 | SK | 23.03.2011 | TR | 23.03.2011 | BG | 23.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | IE | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | LU | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | IS | 23.07.2011 | PT | 25.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
MT | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
TR | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
IE | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
LU | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
MT | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
IE | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
LU | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
MT | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
IE | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
MT | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
IE | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
MT | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
MT | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
BE | 23.03.2011 | ||
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 23.03.2011 | |
CY | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 23.03.2011 | |
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0685306 (CANON KK) [Y] 1-4 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1056138 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1(a)-1(c) *; | [A]US2005161074 (GARVISON PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1* paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1,2 * | International search | [Y]JPH0685306 (CANON KK); | [Y]US5582653 (KATAOKA ICHIRO [JP], et al); | [Y]US6093884 (TOYOMURA FUMITAKA [JP], et al) | by applicant | US4499658 | JPH0685306 | EP1056138 | US2005178248 |