EP2040925 - LAYERED BODY AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THIN SUBSTRATE USING THE LAYERED BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBB, Richard J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
KROPP, Michael A. 3M Center 2501 Hudson Road Saint Paul, Minnesota 55144-1000 / US | [2009/19] |
Former [2009/14] | 01 /
WEBB, Richard J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | ||
02 /
KROPP, Michael A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Representative(s) | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L. 3M Belgium B.V.B.A./S.P.R.L. Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L. 3M Europe S.A./N.V. OIPC Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [2009/14] | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L. 3M Europe S.A./N.V. OIPC Hermeslaan 7 B-1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 07812889.9 | 13.07.2007 | [2009/14] | WO2007US73424 | Priority number, date | US20060457567 | 14.07.2006 Original published format: US 457567 | [2009/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008008931 | Date: | 17.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2040925 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B32B37/02, B32B33/00 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
B32B37/12 (EP,US);
B32B37/02 (KR);
B24B7/228 (EP,US);
B32B33/00 (KR);
H01L21/6835 (EP,US);
H01L21/6836 (EP,US);
B32B2310/0806 (EP,US);
B32B2457/14 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68327 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESCHICHTETES ELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DÜNNEN SUBSTRATS MITHILFE DES GESCHICHTETEN ELEMENTS | [2009/14] | English: | LAYERED BODY AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THIN SUBSTRATE USING THE LAYERED BODY | [2009/14] | French: | CORPS FORMÉ DE COUCHES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE SUBSTRAT MINCE AU MOYEN DU CORPS FORMÉ DE COUCHES | [2009/14] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 24.11.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5604038 (DENES FERENCZ S [US], et al); | [A]US6447884 (BURBERRY MITCHELL S [US], et al); | [A]US6786810 (MUILENBURG MICHAEL J [US], et al) |