EP2046526 - HIGH HARDNESS/HIGH WEAR RESISTANT IRON BASED WELD OVERLAY MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Nanosteel Company, Inc. 272 West Exchange Street, Suite 300 Providence, RI 02903 / US | [2020/22] |
Former [2011/34] | For all designated states The Nanosteel Company, Inc. 272 West Exchange Street, Suite 300 Providence, RI 02903 / US | ||
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states The Nanosteel Company, Inc. 67 Cedar Street, Suite 101 Providence RI 02903 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANAGAN, Daniel, J. 6845 East Sunnyside Idaho Falls, Idaho 83406 / US | 02 /
MARSHALL, Craig, M. 3588 Dayton Street Iona, Idaho 83427 / US | 03 /
MEACHAM, Brian 1274 Boise Ave. Idaho Falls, Idaho 83402 / US | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Richly & Ritschel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 100411 51404 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2020/22] |
Former [2014/04] | Kierdorf Ritschel Sattlerweg 14 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2013/25] | polypatent BGL Sattlerweg 14 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2013/22] | polypatent BGL Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2012/02] | Polypatent Postfach 10 04 11 51404 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2009/16] | Polypatent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 07813043.2 | 18.07.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007US73757 | Priority number, date | US20060458209 | 18.07.2006 Original published format: US 458209 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008011448 | Date: | 24.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2046526 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2046526 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B23K35/22, C22C1/00, C22C38/12, C22C38/36, C22C38/38, C22C45/02 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
B23K35/3026 (EP,US);
B23K35/3053 (EP,US);
C22C1/11 (EP,US);
C22C22/00 (EP,US);
C22C33/003 (EP,US);
C22C33/0228 (EP,US);
C22C33/0285 (EP,US);
C22C33/0292 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/18 (EP,US);
C22C38/22 (EP,US);
C22C38/26 (EP,US);
C22C38/34 (EP,US);
C22C38/38 (EP,US);
C22C45/00 (EP,US);
C22C45/02 (EP,US);
B22F1/05 (EP,US);
B22F2009/0828 (EP,US);
B22F9/08 (EP,US);
B22F9/082 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/16] | B23K35/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/22] |
Former [2009/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUF EISEN BASIERENDE SCHWEISSÜBERLAGERUNGSMATERIALIEN VON HOHER HÄRTE/HOHER VERSCHLEISSBESTÄNDIGKEIT | [2009/16] | English: | HIGH HARDNESS/HIGH WEAR RESISTANT IRON BASED WELD OVERLAY MATERIALS | [2009/16] | French: | MATÉRIAUX DE RECOUVREMENT DE SOUDURE À BASE DE FER TRÈS RÉSISTANTS À L'USURE ET TRÈS RIGIDES | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 18.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2007 | AT | 27.05.2020 | CY | 27.05.2020 | CZ | 27.05.2020 | DK | 27.05.2020 | EE | 27.05.2020 | ES | 27.05.2020 | FI | 27.05.2020 | IT | 27.05.2020 | LT | 27.05.2020 | LV | 27.05.2020 | MC | 27.05.2020 | MT | 27.05.2020 | NL | 27.05.2020 | PL | 27.05.2020 | RO | 27.05.2020 | SE | 27.05.2020 | SI | 27.05.2020 | SK | 27.05.2020 | TR | 27.05.2020 | IE | 18.07.2020 | LU | 18.07.2020 | FR | 27.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | BG | 27.08.2020 | GR | 28.08.2020 | IS | 27.09.2020 | PT | 28.09.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
TR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 18.07.2020 | ||
LU | 18.07.2020 | ||
FR | 27.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 18.07.2020 | ||
LU | 18.07.2020 | ||
FR | 27.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 18.07.2020 | ||
FR | 27.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 18.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 27.05.2020 | |
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 27.05.2020 | |
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 27.05.2020 | |
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 27.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003164209 (POON S JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1,8* claims 1,13 *; | [X]JP2005254271 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [X] 1,2,15,19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0012] - paragraph [0015] *; | [XP]WO2006086350 (NANOSTEEL CO [US], et al) [XP] 1,2,5,8,9,12,15,16,19 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US4101319 (BEYER HORST, et al); | [Y]US4231793 (KRUSKE GERHARD, et al); | [Y]US5003155 (CHAI CHANG-SHUNG [US], et al); | [Y]US5250355 (NEWMAN HAROLD C [US], et al); | [Y]US6007922 (SUE JIINJEN ALBERT [US], et al) |