EP2049837 - BACKPACKING STOVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Coleman Company, Inc. 3600 N. Hydraulic Wichita, KS 67219 / US | [2009/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LONG, Norris, Richard 5166 South Vine Wichita, Kansas 67217 / US | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | Carter, Stephen John Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | Carter, Stephen John Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 07813659.5 | 01.08.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007US74987 | Priority number, date | US20060821522P | 04.08.2006 Original published format: US 821522 P | [2009/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008019273 | Date: | 14.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2049837 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F23D11/38 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
F24C5/00 (EP,US);
F24C14/00 (EP,US);
F24C3/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CAMPINGKOCHER | [2009/17] | English: | BACKPACKING STOVE | [2009/17] | French: | ÉTUVE À PROPULSION DORSALE | [2009/17] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 01.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/40] | 26.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US1463101 (STRAUB OSCAR I, et al); | [Y]US4230446 (FISHER ROBERT E) |