EP2054754 - FOG-RESISTANT GOGGLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states I.E. Manufacturing LLC 3998 Inland Empire Boulevard, Suite 300 Ontario, California 91764 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | For all designated states I.E. Manufacturing LLC 3998 Inland Empire Boulevard, Suite 300 Ontario, California 91764 / CA | ||
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states I.E. Manufacturing LLC 3998 Inland Empire Boulevard Suite 300 Ontario 91764 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOOPER, Bryan 5605 Wesham Place Brea, CA 92821 / US | 02 /
WANG, James, C 22115 Roundup Drive Walmut, CA 91789 / US | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée Boîte Postale 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2009/19] | Petit, Maxime, et al Santarelli 14 avenue de la Grande-Armée B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07813737.9 | 03.08.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007US75148 | Priority number, date | US20060835458P | 04.08.2006 Original published format: US 835458 P | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008019304 | Date: | 14.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2054754 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.03.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/02 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
A61F9/028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEBELRESISTENTE BRILLE | [2009/19] | English: | FOG-RESISTANT GOGGLES | [2009/19] | French: | LUNETTES ANTI-BUÉE | [2009/19] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 19.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/13] | 08.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002023292 (MASUMOTO YUUSUKE [JP]) [X] 1-20 * column 2 - column 3; figure - *; | [X]WO0230227 (SECR DEFENCE [GB], et al) [X] 1-20 * page 2, line 19 - page 2, line 26; figure - *; | [X]US2004103469 (HUSSEY PATRICK P [US]) [X] 1-20* abstract *; | [X]US2005015862 (DONDERO JOHN [US]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005043980 (K2 INC [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * page 4 - page 6; figure - * | International search | [X]US6138285 (ROBRAHN DAVID T [US], et al) |